EP0709732 - Processing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.08.2000 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] | Applicant(s) | For:GB
KODAK LIMITED Headstone Drive Harrow Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | For:DE
FR
Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/18] | For:GB
KODAK LIMITED Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | ||
For:DE
FR
EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Earle, Anthony, c/o Kodak Limited Patent Department, Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex, HA1 4TY / GB | 02 /
Ridgway, Michael, c/o Kodak Limited Patent Department, Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex, HA1 4TY / GB | [1996/18] | Representative(s) | Lee, Brenda, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department (W160-G) Headstone Drive Harrow Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | [2008/30] |
Former [1998/41] | Barker, Brenda, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | ||
Former [1997/35] | Jones, David Colin, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department Headstone Drive GB-Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | ||
Former [1996/18] | Phillips, Margaret Dawn, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | Application number, filing date | 95202905.6 | 26.10.1995 | [1996/18] | Priority number, date | GB19940021812 | 29.10.1994 Original published format: GB 9421812 | [1996/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0709732 | Date: | 01.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G03D3/08, G03D3/10 | [1996/18] | CPC: |
G03D3/08 (EP,US);
G03D3/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/18] | Title | German: | Behandlungsgerät | [1996/18] | English: | Processing apparatus | [1996/18] | French: | Appareil de traitement | [1996/18] | Examination procedure | 01.10.1996 | Examination requested [1996/48] | 16.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/41] | 22.05.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2000/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1999 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]GB1099212 (EASTMAN KODAK CO) [X] 5,9,11 * figures 1,4; claim 1 * [A] 1,8; | [DA]US5184533 (GOLICZ ROMAN M [US]) [DA] 6,8* abstract * | by applicant | EP0401807 | US4990011 | US5184533 | US5222724 | US5255903 | US5316283 |