EP0715974 - Triplex tread [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.07.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.1997 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.08.1997 [1997/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company 1144 East Market Street Akron, OH 44316-0001 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/24] | For all designated states THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY 1144 East Market Street Akron, Ohio 44316-0001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gabor, Jennifer Leigh 706 Orrville Avenue Cuyahoga Falls, OH 44221 / US | 02 /
Rodgers, Michael Brendan 3261 Morewood Road Akron, OH 44333 / US | [1996/24] | Representative(s) | Leitz, Paul Goodyear Technical Center, Patent Department, Avenue Gordon Smith 7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [1996/24] | Leitz, Paul Goodyear Technical Center, Patent Department, Avenue Gordon Smith L-7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | Application number, filing date | 95202920.5 | 30.10.1995 | [1996/24] | Priority number, date | US19940335293 | 07.11.1994 Original published format: US 335293 | [1996/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0715974 | Date: | 12.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B60C11/18, B60C11/00, B60C1/00 | [1996/24] | CPC: |
B60C11/18 (EP);
B60C9/18 (KR);
B60C1/0016 (EP);
B60C11/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1996/24] | Title | German: | Triplex-Lauffläche | [1996/24] | English: | Triplex tread | [1996/24] | French: | Bande de roulement triple | [1996/24] | Examination procedure | 30.10.1995 | Examination requested [1996/24] | 03.07.1997 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1997/35] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS59124411 ; | [X]EP0105822 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) [X] 1,4-7 * figure -; claim -; table - *; | [X]EP0594045 (CONTINENTAL AG [DE]) [X] 1,4-7 * figure -; claim - *; | [X]US4381810 (CADY JOHN M, et al) [X] 1-4 * figure .; claim -; tables 1-3 *; | [X]EP0097787 (CONTINENTAL GUMMI WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4 * figure 1; claim - *; | [X]DE2362627 (CONTINENTAL GUMMI WERKE AG) [X] 1,2,4 * page 3, paragraph 2 - page 4; figure -; claim - *; | [A]EP0604108 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]) [A] 1-3 * page 2, line 16 - line 20 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19841109), vol. 008, no. 244, Database accession no. (M - 337), & JP59124411 A 19840718 (YOKOHAMA GOMU KK) [X] 1,4-8 * abstract * |