EP0710533 - Method, device and relief roller for applying a pattern to a surface of a fibreboard [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 27.03.1998 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.1998 | Refusal of application | published on 13.05.1998 [1998/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOUTHANDEL LAMBERT VAN DEN BOSCH B.V. Sportlaan 4 NL-3905 AD Veenendaal / NL | [1996/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van den Bosch, Lambert Kerkewyk 22 NL-3901 EG Veenendaal / NL | [1996/19] | Representative(s) | Bakker, Gilles Egbert Octrooi- en Merkenbureau De Wit B.V. Breitnerlaan 146 2596 HG Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1996/19] | Bakker, Gilles Egbert, Ir. Octrooi- en Merkenbureau De Wit B.V. Breitnerlaan 146 NL-2596 HG Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 95202931.2 | 31.10.1995 | [1996/19] | Priority number, date | NL19940001818 | 02.11.1994 Original published format: NL 9401818 | [1996/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0710533 | Date: | 08.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B27N7/00 | [1996/19] | CPC: |
B27N7/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1996/19] | Title | German: | Verfahren, Vorrichtung und Prägewalze zum Anbringen eines Musters auf der Oberfläche eine Faserplatte | [1996/19] | English: | Method, device and relief roller for applying a pattern to a surface of a fibreboard | [1996/19] | French: | Procédé, dispositif et rouleau d'impression pour l'application d'un dessin sur la surface d'un panneau du fibre | [1996/19] | Examination procedure | 28.08.1996 | Examination requested [1996/43] | 08.10.1996 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 04.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.11.1996 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 02.05.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 12.12.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1998/20] | 22.12.1997 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1998/20] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1997 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4007767 (COLLEDGE GARY C) [X] 1-4,9-15,19 * column 3, line 51 - column 4, line 2 * * column 4, line 16 - line 46; figure -; claim - * [A] 5-8,16-18,20; | [X]US4104429 (COLLEDGE GARY C) [X] 1,4 * the whole document *; | [A]US4007076 (CLARKE JOHN T, et al); | [A]DE2421576 (STATENS SKOGSIND AB); | [A]EP0371371 (TOPAN GMBH [DE]); | [A]US4221758 (BURKEY DAVID J, et al); | [A]US3483057 (MITTMAN EMANUEL) | by applicant | US4197078 | EP0187665 |