EP0713798 - Dashboard assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.1999 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.04.1999 [1999/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delphi Automotive Systems Deutschland GmbH Reinshagenstrasse 1 D-42369 Wuppertal / DE | [1997/29] |
Former [1996/22] | For all designated states ACG DEUTSCHLAND GmbH Stahlstrasse 42-44 D-65428 Rüsselsheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heck, Thomas 602515 Am Konigs Born 17 D-55126 Mainz / DE | [1996/22] | Representative(s) | Denton, Michael John Delphi France SAS Bât. le Raspail - ZAC Paris Nord 2 22, avenue des Nations CS 65059 Villepinte 95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/22] | Denton, Michael John Patent Section 1st Floor Gideon House 28 Chapel Street Luton Bedfordshire LU1 2SE / GB | Application number, filing date | 95202981.7 | 02.11.1995 | [1996/22] | Priority number, date | GB19940023776 | 25.11.1994 Original published format: GB 9423776 | GB19950015834 | 02.08.1995 Original published format: GB 9515834 | [1996/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0713798 | Date: | 29.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0713798 | Date: | 29.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B60K37/00, B60H1/00 | [1996/22] | CPC: |
B60H1/00028 (EP);
B60K37/00 (EP);
B60H2001/00107 (EP);
B60H2001/00192 (EP);
B60K2360/658 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1996/22] | Title | German: | Armaturenbrett-Anordnung | [1996/22] | English: | Dashboard assembly | [1996/22] | French: | Ensemble de tableau de bord | [1996/22] | Examination procedure | 29.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/04] | 30.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.10.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0687164 ; | [A]JPS57201621 ; | [A]US4223754 (MIZUNO HIROSHI, et al) [A] 1,2 * column W *; | [DA]EP0185856 (FORD WERKE AG [DE], et al) [DA] 1-4,6,7 * column A; figure 3 *; | [X]FR2696382 (FRANCE DESIGN [FR]) [X] 1-4 * abstract *; | [DA]EP0607585 (BORLETTI CLIMATIZZAZIONE [IT]) [DA] 1,2,4 * column W * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940630), vol. 18, no. 348, Database accession no. (M - 1630), & JP0687164 A 19940329 (STAR MICRONICS) [A] 1,2,4 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830305), vol. 7, no. 55, Database accession no. (M - 198), & JP57201621 A 19821210 (KANTOU SEIKI) [A] 1,4 * abstract * | by applicant | US4733739 | EP0607585 |