EP0712922 - Process for improving lubricating base oil quality [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.12.2000 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.02.2001 [2001/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2000/08] | For all designated states SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [1996/21] | For all designated states SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 NL-2596 HR Den Haag / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dagorn, Daniel N.N., c/o Shell Recherche S.A. Centre de Recherche, Route de Caen F-76530 Grand Couronne / FR | 02 /
Mahtout Grandvallet, Taous, c/o Shell Recherche S. Centre de Recherche, Route de Caen F-76530 Grand Couronne / FR | 03 /
Grandvallet, Pierre, c/o Shell Recherche S.A. Centre de Recherche, Route de Caen F-76530 Grand Couronne / FR | 04 /
Scheffer, Bob Badhuisweg 3 NL-1031 CM Amsterdam / NL | [1996/21] | Application number, filing date | 95203127.6 | 15.11.1995 | [1996/21] | Priority number, date | EP19940402602 | 16.11.1994 Original published format: EP 94402602 | [1996/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0712922 | Date: | 22.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0712922 | Date: | 23.10.1996 | [1996/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0712922 | Date: | 23.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C10G25/00, C10G67/06 | [1996/21] | CPC: |
C10G67/06 (EP);
C10G25/00 (EP);
C10G25/003 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1996/21] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Qualitätsverbesserung von Basisschmierölen | [1996/21] | English: | Process for improving lubricating base oil quality | [1996/21] | French: | Procédé pour améliorer la qualité d'huile lubrifiante de base | [1996/21] | Examination procedure | 12.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/15] | 28.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.08.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.11.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1109731 (MOBIL OIL CORP) [X] 1-5 * page 3, line 130; tables -1520-23 *; | [X]US2038604 (ROBERTSON LOUIE H, et al) [X] 1-3 * column 1, line 10 - line 23 *; | [X]US2300420 (HASSLER JOHN W, et al) [X] 1 * claims 1-3 *; | [A]GB860333 (UNIVERSAL OIL PROD CO); | [A]BE637589 (ESSO) | Examination | - J.S. MATTSON, H.B. MARK,JR., Activated Carbon, NEW-YORK, MARCEL DECCKER INC., 1971 | - Fluka guide, BUCHS (CH), FLUKA CHEMIE AG, 1997 | - A. CAPELLE, F. DE VOOYS, Activated Carbon...a fascinating material, AMERSFOORT (NL), NORIT N.V., 1983 | by applicant | US4795546 | EP0535910 | US4600502 | US3697414 | US4447315 | US4747937 | US4954242 | GB1429494 | GB1546504 | EP0178710 | EP0272729 | GB2014058 | EP0026508 | EP0450997 |