EP0743443 - Thrust reverser synchronization shaft lock [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2001 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US | For all designated states Hydraulics Units Incorporated D/b/a/ Dowty Aerospace Los Angeles, 1700 Business Center Drive Duarte, California 91010-2859 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/40] | For all designated states THE BOEING COMPANY P.O. Box 3707, M.S. 13-08 Seattle, Washington 98124-2207 / US | ||
For all designated states Hydraulics Units Incorporated D/b/a/ Dowty Aerospace Los Angeles, 1700 Business Center Drive Duarte, California 91010-2859 / US | |||
Former [1999/35] | For all designated states Hydraulics Units Incorporated D/b/a/ Dowty Aerospace Los Angeles, 1700 Business Center Drive Duarte, California 91010-2859 / US | ||
Former [1996/47] | For all designated states THE BOEING COMPANY P.O. Box 3707, M.S. 13-08 Seattle, Washington 98124-2207 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jackson, John 12005 S.E. 73rd Place Renton, Washington 98056 / US | 02 /
Smith, Mark H., 5320 Beacon Drive c/o Rime Gardens Suites, Apt. no. 6018 Birmingham, Alabama 35210 / US | 03 /
Gucker, Mark J. 10712 N.E. 114th Place Kirkland, Washington 98033 / US | [1996/47] | Representative(s) | Bartelds, Erik, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Bartelds, Erik, et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK The Hague / NL | ||
Former [2000/22] | Bartelds, Erik, et al Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [1999/35] | Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling, et al Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [1996/47] | Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 95203239.9 | 24.11.1995 | [1996/47] | Priority number, date | US19950441581 | 15.05.1995 Original published format: US 441581 | [1996/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0743443 | Date: | 20.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0743443 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.1996 | Classification | IPC: | F02K1/76 | [1996/47] | CPC: |
F02K1/76 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/47] | Title | German: | Verriegelung für eine Synchronisierungswelle einer Schubumkehrvorrichtung | [1996/47] | English: | Thrust reverser synchronization shaft lock | [1996/47] | French: | Dispositif de verrouillage pour l'arbre de synchronisation d'un inverseur de poussée | [1996/47] | Examination procedure | 29.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/05] | 06.05.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.11.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.12.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0506277 (LUCAS IND PLC [GB]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0536954 (LUCAS IND PLC [GB]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]WO9407018 (BOEING CO [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | US4586329 |