EP0666457 - Electronic defrost controller with fan delay and drip time modes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.12.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.01.1999 [1999/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PARAGON ELECTRIC COMPANY, INC. 606 Parkway Boulevard, P.O. Box 28 Two Rivers, WI 54241 / US | [1995/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Novak, Robert M. 818 York Street, Apt. A Manitowoc, WI 54220 / US | [1995/32] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/32] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 D-22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 95250016.3 | 24.01.1995 | [1995/32] | Priority number, date | US19940194107 | 08.02.1994 Original published format: US 194107 | [1995/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0666457 | Date: | 09.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F25D21/06 | [1995/32] | CPC: |
F25D21/002 (EP,US);
F25D21/08 (KR);
F25B2600/23 (EP,US);
F25B2700/2117 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/32] | Title | German: | Elektronische Abtausteuervorrichtung mit Betriebsarten für Lüfterverzögerung und für Abtropfzeit | [1995/32] | English: | Electronic defrost controller with fan delay and drip time modes | [1995/32] | French: | Dispositif électronique de commande de dégivrage comprenant des modes à retardement de ventilateur et à temps d'égouttement | [1995/32] | Examination procedure | 27.09.1995 | Examination requested [1995/48] | 15.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.11.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/04] | 27.08.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1999/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1998 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0154119 (DANNER SCHUTZGASTECH & APP [DE]) [A] 1,2,10-12,15-17,20-23,26-28 * page 7, line 8 - page 15, line 6; figure . *; | [A]US3922874 (CANTER JAMES A) [A] 1,2,15,21,26,31 * column 1, line 36 - column 3, line 26; figure . *; | [A]US4373350 (NOLAND JOSEPH R) [A] 1,2,15,20,21,26 * column 3, line 20 - column 8, line 38; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US3174297 (KUHN ALBERT J, et al) [A] 1,2,15,21,26,31 * column 2, line 39 - column 8, line 16; figures 1-6 *; | [A]GB1239223 (HERON ELECTRICAL DEVICES); | [A]DE4222544 (LINDE AG [DE]); | [A]US3527289 (FOESSL JOHN K); | [A]EP0494785 (MORRIS MICHAEL [GB], et al) |