EP0678892 - Method for manufacturing luminous tube systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/43] | Method and arrangement for determining measurement accuracy and for documenting quality control in the manufacture of luminous tubes | ||
[2005/33] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.11.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 21.05.2008 [2008/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Uecker, Horst Schillerpromenade 36 12049 Berlin / DE | [2000/05] |
Former [1995/43] | For all designated states Meyer Neontrafoproduktion GmbH & Co. Zossener Strasse 29b D-15838 Sperenberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Uecker, Horst Schillerpromenade 36 D-12049 Berlin / DE | 02 /
Zantis, Heinrich Windenweg 3a D-12357 Berlin / DE | [1996/03] |
Former [1995/43] | 01 /
Uecker, Horst Schillerpromenade 36 D-12049 Berlin / DE | Representative(s) | Wablat, Wolfgang Patentanwalt Dr. Dr. W. Wablat Potsdamer Chaussee 48 14129 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/43] | Wablat, Wolfgang, Dr.Dr. Patentanwalt, Dr. Dr. W. Wablat, Potsdamer Chaussee 48 D-14129 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 95250041.1 | 17.02.1995 | [1995/43] | Priority number, date | DE19944414558 | 22.04.1994 Original published format: DE 4414558 | [1995/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0678892 | Date: | 25.10.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0678892 | Date: | 20.08.1997 | [1997/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0678892 | Date: | 04.01.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H01J9/00, H01J9/42, G08C23/06, G01K1/02, G01K1/16, H01J9/04 | [1997/34] | CPC: |
H01J9/42 (EP);
H01J9/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1995/43] | H01J9/00, H01J9/42 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/43] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Leuchtröhrensystemen | [2005/33] | English: | Method for manufacturing luminous tube systems | [2005/33] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de systèmes de tubes lumineux | [2005/33] |
Former [1995/43] | Verfahren und Anordnung zum Nachweis der Messgenauigkeit und zur Dokumentation für die Qualitätssicherung bei der Herstellung von Leuchtröhren systemen | ||
Former [1995/43] | Method and arrangement for determining measurement accuracy and for documenting quality control in the manufacture of luminous tubes | ||
Former [1995/43] | Procédé et système pour la détermination de la précision de mesure et pour la documentation du contrôle de qualité pendant la fabrication des tubes lumineux | Examination procedure | 19.02.1998 | Examination requested [1998/17] | 09.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.02.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 18.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IE | 04.01.2006 | NL | 04.01.2006 | AT | 17.02.2006 | BE | 28.02.2006 | CH | 28.02.2006 | LI | 28.02.2006 | MC | 28.02.2006 | LU | 04.03.2006 | DK | 04.04.2006 | SE | 04.04.2006 | GR | 05.04.2006 | ES | 15.04.2006 | PT | 05.06.2006 | [2008/21] |
Former [2007/29] | IE | 04.01.2006 | |
NL | 04.01.2006 | ||
AT | 17.02.2006 | ||
BE | 28.02.2006 | ||
CH | 28.02.2006 | ||
LI | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
LU | 04.03.2006 | ||
DK | 04.04.2006 | ||
SE | 04.04.2006 | ||
ES | 15.04.2006 | ||
PT | 05.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/16] | IE | 04.01.2006 | |
NL | 04.01.2006 | ||
BE | 28.02.2006 | ||
CH | 28.02.2006 | ||
LI | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
LU | 04.03.2006 | ||
DK | 04.04.2006 | ||
SE | 04.04.2006 | ||
ES | 15.04.2006 | ||
PT | 05.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | IE | 04.01.2006 | |
NL | 04.01.2006 | ||
CH | 28.02.2006 | ||
LI | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
DK | 04.04.2006 | ||
SE | 04.04.2006 | ||
ES | 15.04.2006 | ||
PT | 05.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/01] | IE | 04.01.2006 | |
NL | 04.01.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
DK | 04.04.2006 | ||
SE | 04.04.2006 | ||
ES | 15.04.2006 | ||
PT | 05.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | IE | 04.01.2006 | |
NL | 04.01.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 04.04.2006 | ||
ES | 15.04.2006 | ||
PT | 05.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | NL | 04.01.2006 | |
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 04.04.2006 | ||
ES | 15.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/44] | MC | 28.02.2006 | |
ES | 15.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | ES | 15.04.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2208017 (HASLER GMBH) [Y] 1-3 * page 1, line 5 - line 10 * * page 2, line 15 - line 26 * * page 4, line 5 - page 10, line 16 *; | [A]US4157206 (IKEDA TAKESHI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 1 - column 2 *; | [A]US4313344 (BROGARDH TORGNY, et al) [A] 10 * abstract ** column 1, line 1 - line 13 *; | [A]DE3150025 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP [US]) [A] 1 * page 7, line 13 - page 9, line L *; | [X]WO8404439 (CENTRAL ELECTR GENERAT BOARD [GB]) [X] 10 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - line 17 * * page 7, line 12 - line 21 * * page 9, line 13 - line 20 * * page 10, line 1 - line 9 * * page 12, line 13 - line 20 *; | [X]WO8505178 (FOXBORO CO [US]) [X] 10 * abstract * * page 2, paragraph L * * page 8, line 19 - line 26 * * page 12, line 23 - page 13, line 6 * * page 26, paragraph L *; | [A]DE3442583 (VOHRER CHRISTOPH) [A] 10 * abstract * * page 9, line 20 - line 32 * * page 10, line 30 - line 34 * * page 11, line 10 - line 25 * * page 12, line 30 - line L * * page 14, line 15 - line 19 *; | [X]GB2203541 (VAISALA OY, et al) [X] 10 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - line 19 * * page 3, paragraph L *; | [X]DE3907033 (FLOW COMP INGENIEUR GMBH [DE]) [X] 10 * abstract * * column 1 - column 3, line 29 * * column 3, line 40 - column 4, line 15 * * column 4, line 38 - line L * * column 5, line 50 - line 60 *; | [A]EP0460294 (FETTE WILHELM GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * column 1 - column 2, line 4 *; | [A]DE4103166 (SCHULZ RUDOLF [DE]) [A] 1,3 * column 1, line 1 - column 3, line 3 * * column 4, line 35 - line 50 *; | [A]FR2671628 (DORYOKURO KAKUNENRYO [JP]) [A] 10 * abstract *; | [X]FR2683901 (ALSTHOM CGE ALCATEL [FR]) [X] 10 * page 4, line 4 - line 17 *; | [Y] - KONDO N ET AL, "Flexible bulb producing machine", INSPEC, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS, STEVENAGE, GB, XP002024158 [Y] 1-3 * abstract * | [ ] - JOURNAL OF THE ILLUMINATING ENGINEERING INSTITUTE OF JAPAN, MAY 1986, JAPAN, ISSN 0019-2341, vol. 70, no. 5, pages 207 - 211 | [Y] - MAEDA Y ET AL, "High throughput automated PV cell/module manufacturing plant", INSPEC, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS, STEVENAGE, GB, XP002024159 [Y] 1,3 * abstract * | [ ] - PHOTOVOLTAICS FOR COMMERCIAL SOLAR POWER APPLICATIONS, CAMBRIDGE, MA, USA, 18-19 SEPT. 1986, ISSN 0277-786X, PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE - THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING, 1986, USA, vol. 706, pages 40 - 45 | [A] - JANSSON B J N, "Standardisation and quality assurance in the lamp industry", INSPEC, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS, STEVENAGE, GB, XP002024161 [A] 1 * abstract * | [ ] - LIGHTING RESEARCH AND TECHNOLOGY, 1978, UK, ISSN 0024-3426, vol. 10, no. 4, pages 196 - 198 | Examination | JPH0562598 | DE1589179 | DE2212536 | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930713), vol. 017, no. 371, Database accession no. (E - 1396), & JP05062598 A 19930312 (TOSHIBA LIGHTING & TECHNOL CORP) | - TRUCHARD J.J., "Software technology for automated measurements", (29890425), pages 259 - 262, XP010085113 |