EP0684178 - Arrangement of a shaped assembly-part on the fender of a motor car [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.09.1999 [1999/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arenhold, Knut Westend 7 D-22605 Hamburg / DE | [1995/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1995/48] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/48] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 D-22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 95250116.1 | 16.05.1995 | [1995/48] | Priority number, date | DE19944419378 | 27.05.1994 Original published format: DE 4419378 | [1995/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0684178 | Date: | 29.11.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0684178 | Date: | 23.09.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B62D25/18, B62D25/16 | [1995/48] | CPC: |
B62D25/18 (EP,US);
B62D25/161 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, PT [1995/48] | Title | German: | Formteilanordnung am Radausschnitt eines Personenkraftwagens | [1995/48] | English: | Arrangement of a shaped assembly-part on the fender of a motor car | [1995/48] | French: | Aménagement d'une pièce préformée pour le garde-boue d'un véhicule automobile | [1995/48] | Examination procedure | 29.05.1996 | Examination requested [1996/30] | 14.01.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.03.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS60148777 ; | [A]US2282443 (WILSON WILLIAM C) [A] 1 * page 2, column L, line 42 - column R, line 15; figure 5 *; | [A]FR736027 (WIRE ON) [A] 1 * page 2, line 36 - page 3, line 5; figure - * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19851210), vol. 009, no. 313, Database accession no. (M - 437), & JP60148777 A 19850806 (KINUGAWA GOMU KOGYO KK) [A] 1 * abstract * |