EP0689950 - Method of monitoring conditions of vehicle tires and tires containing a monitoring device therein [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.2000 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.04.2000 [2000/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRIDGESTONE/FIRESTONE, Inc. 1200 Firestone Parkway Akron Ohio 44317-0001 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/01] | For all designated states BRIDGESTONE/FIRESTONE, Inc. 1200 Firestone Parkway Akron, Ohio 44317-0001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koch, Russell W. 2135 Howard Street Hartville, OH 44632 / US | 02 /
Takigawa, Hiroyoshi 2112 Long Hunter Lane Nashville, TN 37217 / US | 03 /
Turner, John L. 135 Melbourne Avenue Akron, OH 44313 / US | 04 /
Okamoto, Keizo 1030 Grove Circle Murfreesboro, TN 37129 / US | 05 /
Walenga, Guy J. 704 Valley Brook Drive Mt. Juliet, TN 37122 / US | [1996/01] | Representative(s) | von Raffay, Vincenz, et al Patentanwälte Raffay & Fleck Geffckenstrasse 6 20249 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/01] | von Raffay, Vincenz, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Raffay & Fleck Postfach 32 32 17 D-20117 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 95250129.4 | 30.05.1995 | [1996/01] | Priority number, date | US19940253885 | 03.06.1994 Original published format: US 253885 | [1996/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0689950 | Date: | 03.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0689950 | Date: | 21.08.1996 | [1996/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0689950 | Date: | 28.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B60C23/04 | [1996/01] | CPC: |
B60C23/0442 (EP);
B60C23/0493 (EP,US);
B29D2030/0072 (EP,US);
B29D2030/0077 (EP,US);
B29D2030/0083 (EP,US);
Y10T152/10819 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1996/01] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Überwachung von Fahrzeugreifen und Reifen mit einer Überwachungseinrichtung | [1996/42] | English: | Method of monitoring conditions of vehicle tires and tires containing a monitoring device therein | [1996/01] | French: | Procédé de surveillance de l'état de pneumatiques de véhicules et pneumatiques comportant un dispositif de surveillance | [1996/01] |
Former [1996/01] | Verfahren zur Überwachung von Fahrzeugreifen und Reifen mit ein Überwachungs Einrichtung | Examination procedure | 02.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/01] | 25.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.10.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0505906 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) [A] 1,4 * column 8, line 30 - line 39 * * column 10, line 50 - column 11, line 8; figure - *; | [A]US3787806 (CHURCH D) [A] 1 * column 2, line 49 - column 3, line 4; figure 2 *; | [PA]EP0639472 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [PA] 1,4 * column 8, line 15 - column 9, line 30; figures 16A-18B *; | [A]US4067235 (MARKLAND RICHARD DONALD, et al) [A] 1,4 * column 6, line 61 - column 7, line 4 * * column 9, line 7 - line 32; figures 3,7,8 *; | [A]US3662335 (FRITZE KURT) [A] 1,3 * column 3, line 59 - line 71; figure 2 *; | [A]WO9406640 (OTTER CONTROL LIMITED [GB], et al) [A] 5-7 * figures 1,5,8-10; claims 1,3,8,9 *; | [A]DE3736803 (VDO SCHINDLING [DE]) [A] 5 * abstract *; | [A]GB2243010 (BADER STANLEIGH, et al) [A] 6,7 * page 3, paragraph 5; figure - *; | [E]WO9522467 (COMPUTER METHODS CORP [US]) [E] 5-10 * the whole document * | by applicant | US4718469 | US4765852 | US4923543 |