EP0713775 - Arrangement for a modular ink jet print head [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.08.2000 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.08.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.09.2000 [2000/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Francotyp-Postalia Aktiengesellschaft & Co. Triftweg 21-26 16547 Birkenwerder / DE | [1996/27] |
Former [1996/22] | For all designated states Francotyp-Postalia GmbH Triftweg 21-26 D-16547 Birkenwerder / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Günther, Stephan Forstweg 63a D-13465 Berlin / DE | 02 /
Kubatzki, Ralf Prenzlauer Allee 191 D-10405 Berlin / DE | 03 /
Thiel, Wolfgang, Dr. Bohnsackersteig 8 D-13503 Berlin / DE | 04 /
Zhang, Junming, Dr. Keithstrasse 19 D-10787 Berlin / DE | [1996/22] | Application number, filing date | 95250260.7 | 27.10.1995 | [1996/22] | Priority number, date | DE19944443244 | 25.11.1994 Original published format: DE 4443244 | [1996/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0713775 | Date: | 29.05.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0713775 | Date: | 09.07.1997 | [1997/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0713775 | Date: | 06.10.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/14, B41J2/145, B41J2/155 | [1997/26] | CPC: |
B41J2/14233 (EP,US);
B41J2002/14379 (EP,US);
B41J2002/14491 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/22] | B41J2/14 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1996/22] | Title | German: | Anordnung für einen Tintendruckkopf aus einzelnen Tintendruckmodulen | [1996/22] | English: | Arrangement for a modular ink jet print head | [1996/22] | French: | Agencement pour une tête d'impression à jet d'encre modulaire | [1996/22] | Examination procedure | 31.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/40] | 24.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.11.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.03.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 15.04.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO8100151 (BURROUGHS CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * the whole document * [Y] 4,5; | [Y]FR2574021 (CANON KK [JP]) [Y] 4,5 * figures 13,20; claims 1,3-5 *; | [A]US4605939 (HUBBARD DAVID W [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * column 3, line 26 - column 4, line 36; figures 1-6 *; | [A]US4392145 (PARKOLA WALTER R) [A] 1-3 * column 2, line 40 - column 3, line 9; figure 2 *; | [A]US4752789 (MALTSEV VIACHESLAV B [US]) [A] 1-3 * column 3, line 19 - line 32; figure 2 *; | [A]EP0486256 (CITIZEN WATCH CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-3,6,7 * figures 1-4,25; claim 1 *; | [DA]US4703333 (HUBBARD DAVID W [US]) [DA] 1-3 * column W * | by applicant | DE4225799 | DE3805279 | GB2264086 | US4703333 |