EP0663596 - Electro-optic voltage probe with fibre optic plate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.07.2001 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2001 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.09.2001 [2001/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS K.K. 1126-1 Ichino-cho Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/29] | For all designated states HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS K.K. 1126-1 Ichino-cho Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takahashi, Hironori c/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K., 1126-1, Ichino-cho Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | 02 /
Hiruma, Teruo c/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K., 1126-1, Ichino-cho Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | [1995/40] |
Former [1995/29] | 01 /
Takahashi, Hironori c/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K., 1126-1, Ichino-cho Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Hiruma, Terua c/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K., 1126-1, Ichino-cho Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Whitten, George Alan, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/29] | Whitten, George Alan, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co., 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 95300185.6 | 12.01.1995 | [1995/29] | Priority number, date | JP19940001622 | 12.01.1994 Original published format: JP 162294 | JP19940300942 | 05.12.1994 Original published format: JP 30094294 | [1995/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0663596 | Date: | 19.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0663596 | Date: | 07.08.1996 | [1996/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G01R1/067, G01R1/07 | [1996/27] | CPC: |
G01R1/071 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/29] | G01R1/067 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1995/29] | Title | German: | Elektrooptische Spannungssonde mit faseroptischer Platte | [1995/29] | English: | Electro-optic voltage probe with fibre optic plate | [1995/29] | French: | Sonde électro-optique de potentiel avec une plaque de fibres optiques | [1995/29] | Examination procedure | 28.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/13] | 13.07.2001 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2001/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0541139 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [Y] 1-14 * column 15, line 4 - line 28; figures 3C,6; claims 10,13 *; | [Y]EP0297562 (HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS KK [JP]) [Y] 1-14 * abstract * * column 7, line 57 - column 8, line 3 * * column 9, line 5 - line 10 *; | [D]JPS649370 (HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS KK); | [A]EP0299432 (HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS KK [JP]) [A] 1 * figures 6,7 *; | [AP]EP0581556 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [AP] * page 4, line 42 - line 45; figure 5; claims 4,5,8,9 * * page 11, line 6 - line L *; | [XP]EP0586202 (HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS KK [JP]) [XP] 13,14 * figures 8,9 *; | [XP]EP0613016 (HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS KK [JP]) [XP] 13,14 * figure 18 *; | [X]WO9005322 (GEORGIA TECH RES INST [US]) [X] 13,14 * page 1, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2; figures 5,6 * * page 3, paragraph 2 * |