EP0685671 - A fluid supply valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.2001 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAEWOO ELECTRONICS CO., LTD 541, 5-Ga, Namdaemoon-Ro, Jung-Ku Seoul / KR | [1995/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Jinsoo 316-3, Hyoseong-Dong, Buk-ku Incheon / KR | [1995/49] | Representative(s) | Needle, Jacqueline Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/49] | Needle, Jacqueline W.H. BECK, GREENER & CO 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn London WC2A 3SZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 95300372.0 | 20.01.1995 | [1995/49] | Priority number, date | KR19120058894 | 31.05.1994 Original published format: KR 1258894 | KR19120059794 | 31.05.1994 Original published format: KR 1259794 | [1995/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0685671 | Date: | 06.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0685671 | Date: | 10.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F16K31/08, F16K31/40 | [1995/49] | CPC: |
F16K31/082 (EP,US);
F16K31/404 (EP,US);
H01F2007/1684 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR [1995/49] | Title | German: | Fluidventil | [1995/49] | English: | A fluid supply valve | [1995/49] | French: | Soupape pour fluides | [1995/49] | Examination procedure | 24.05.1996 | Examination requested [1996/30] | 28.05.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 04.02.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.11.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 10.05.2000 | FR | 10.05.2000 | DE | 11.08.2000 | [2006/14] |
Former [2002/26] | ES | 10.05.2000 | |
DE | 11.08.2000 | ||
FR | 06.10.2000 | ||
Former [2002/13] | DE | 11.08.2000 | |
FR | 06.10.2000 | ||
Former [2001/24] | FR | 06.10.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPS60116980 ; | [A]JPS59110983 ; | [A]DE2261278 (DUNGS KARL FA) [A] 8,9* figure 1 *; | [A]EP0219572 (LEYBOLD HERAEUS GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 7 * figure 1 * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19851030), vol. 9, no. 272, Database accession no. (M - 425)<1995>, & JP60116980 A 19850624 (MATSUSHITA) [X] 1-3 * abstract * [A] 4-6,8 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19841023), vol. 8, no. 230, Database accession no. (M - 333)<1667>, & JP59110983 A 19840627 (MITSUBISHI) [A] 8,9 * abstract * |