EP0697246 - Random packing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.2000 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.03.2000 [2000/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JAEGER PRODUCTS, INCORPORATED 1611 Peachleaf Houston, Texas 77039 / US | [1998/39] |
Former [1996/08] | For all designated states JAEGER PRODUCTS, INCORPORATED P.O. Box 1563 Spring Texas 77383 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Seah, Alexander Min (deceased) / US | 02 /
Halbirt, John P. 3903 Laverock Spring, TX 77388 / US | [1996/08] | Representative(s) | Allam, Peter Clerk Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/08] | Allam, Peter Clerk LLOYD WISE, TREGEAR & CO. Norman House 105-109 Strand London WC2R 0AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 95300545.1 | 27.01.1995 | [1996/08] | Priority number, date | US19940291723 | 16.08.1994 Original published format: US 291723 | US19940365939 | 29.12.1994 Original published format: US 365939 | [1996/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0697246 | Date: | 21.02.1996 | [1996/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0697246 | Date: | 27.03.1996 | [1996/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0697246 | Date: | 17.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B01J19/30 | [1996/08] | CPC: |
B01J19/30 (EP);
B01J2219/30276 (EP);
B01J2219/30296 (EP);
B01J2219/30408 (EP);
B01J2219/30466 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1996/08] | Title | German: | Füllkörper | [1996/08] | English: | Random packing | [1996/08] | French: | Elément de garnissage | [1996/08] | Examination procedure | 26.08.1996 | Examination requested [1996/43] | 12.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.10.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 10.12.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 06.08.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 11.08.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.12.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/10] | Request for further processing for: | 10.12.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 10.12.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.01.1998 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3311356 (ECKERT JOHN S) [A] 1-17 * figure - *; | [A]FR2299068 (CITTEN LTD [GB]) [A] 1-17 * figure - *; | [A]US4041113 (MCKEOWN KEVIN JOSEPH) [A] 1-17 * figures 4-7 *; | [A]FR2407014 (NORTON CO [US]) [A] 1-17 * figure - *; | [A]EP0143902 (VER FUELLKOERPER FAB [DE]) [A] 1-17 * figure - *; | [A]EP0176174 (NUTTER DALE E) [A] 1-17 * figures 7-9 *; | [A]US5112536 (MCNULTY KENNETH J [US], et al) [A] 1-17* figures 10-13 * |