EP0668394 - Method and apparatus for sheet formation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.2003 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.06.2003 [2003/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tokushu Paper Manufacturing Co. Ltd 501, Honjuku, Nagaizumi-cho Suntoh-gun Shizuoka-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/01] | For all designated states Tokushu Paper Manufacturing Co. Ltd 501, Honjuku, Nagaizumi-cho Suntoh-gun, Shizuoka-ken / JP | ||
Former [1995/34] | For all designated states TOKUSHU PAPER MFG. CO., LTD 501, Honjuku, Nagaizumi-cho Suntou-gun, Shizuoka 411 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hanaya, Morimasa 9-13, Hatsunedai Mishima-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | [1995/34] | Representative(s) | Dealtry, Brian Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/34] | Dealtry, Brian Eric Potter & Clarkson St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham NG1 1LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 95300632.7 | 01.02.1995 | [1995/34] | Priority number, date | JP19940030963 | 02.02.1994 Original published format: JP 3096394 | [1995/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0668394 | Date: | 23.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0668394 | Date: | 12.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.1995 | Classification | IPC: | D21F9/00, D21F11/04 | [1995/34] | CPC: |
D21F9/003 (EP,US);
D21F1/48 (EP,US);
D21F11/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/34] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung einer Faserstoffbahn | [1995/34] | English: | Method and apparatus for sheet formation | [1995/34] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de formation d'une bande fibreuse | [1995/34] | Examination procedure | 02.02.1996 | Examination requested [1996/14] | 28.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.12.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.11.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE3100713 (ESCHER WYSS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-8 * the whole document * [A] 10,11; | [A]GB2106945 (ESCHER WYSS GMBH [DE]) [A] 9* the whole document *; | [XA]US4532008 (CREAGAN RICHARD W [CA], et al) [X] 1-8 * column W * [A] 10-13; | [A]EP0153288 (PLANK M K CORP [US]) [A] 9 * column W *; | [XA]EP0552139 (VALMET PAPER MACHINERY INC [FI]) [X] 1-8 * column W * [A] 10-13 |