EP0666344 - High-strength ultra-fine fiber construction and method for producing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/32] | High-strength ultra-fine fiber construction, method for producing the same and high-strength conjugate fiber | ||
[1998/47] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.07.2000 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.07.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.09.2000 [2000/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TORAY INDUSTRIES, INC. 2-1, Nihonbashi Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/38] | For all designated states TORAY INDUSTRIES, INC. 2-1, Nihonbashi Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | ||
Former [1995/32] | For all designated states TORAY INDUSTRIES, INC. 2-1, Nihonbashi Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mizuki, Tatsuro Toray - Shataku D-303 145, Aza Motonagare, Tsutsubari-cho Okazaki-shi, Aichi / JP | 02 /
Tahara, Akio 145, Aza Motonagare, Tsutsubari-cho Okazaki-shi, Aichi / JP | 03 /
Takahashi, Hiroshi 2-51, Higashi-cho Mishima-shi, Shizuoka / JP | [1995/41] |
Former [1995/32] | 01 /
Mizuki, Tatsuro 145, Aza Motonagare, Tsutsubari-cho Okazaki-shi, Aichi / JP | ||
02 /
Tahara, Akio 145, Aza Motonagare, Tsutsubari-cho Okazaki-shi, Aichi / JP | |||
03 /
Takahashi, Hiroshi 2-51, Higashi-cho Mishima-shi, Shizuoka / JP | Representative(s) | Coleiro, Raymond, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/32] | Coleiro, Raymond, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 95300738.2 | 07.02.1995 | [1995/32] | Priority number, date | JP19940013832 | 07.02.1994 Original published format: JP 1383294 | [1995/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0666344 | Date: | 09.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0666344 | Date: | 22.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.1995 | Classification | IPC: | D01F8/14, D01F8/12, B60R21/16 | [1995/32] | CPC: |
B60R21/235 (EP,KR,US);
D01D5/34 (KR);
D01F8/12 (EP,KR,US);
D01F8/14 (EP,KR,US);
B60R2021/23509 (KR);
D10B2505/124 (KR);
Y10T428/2924 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2929 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2931 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1995/32] | Title | German: | Konstruktion aus hochfesten ultrafeinen Fasern und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1998/47] | English: | High-strength ultra-fine fiber construction and method for producing the same | [1998/47] | French: | Construction à base de fibres ultrafines à haute ténacité et procédé pour sa fabrication | [1998/47] |
Former [1995/32] | Konstruktion aus hochfesten ultrafeinen Fasern, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und hochfeste zusammengesetzte Faser | ||
Former [1995/32] | High-strength ultra-fine fiber construction, method for producing the same and high-strength conjugate fiber | ||
Former [1995/32] | Construction à base de fibres ultrafines à haute ténacité, procédé pour sa fabrication et fibre conjuguée à haute ténacité | Examination procedure | 01.02.1996 | Examination requested [1996/14] | 10.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.01.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 15.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 23.03.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH05106117 ; | [DA]JPH05213131 ; | [DA]JPH04361659 ; | [A]JPH04209825 | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 21, no. 93, Database accession no. 93-172989, & JPH05106117 A 19930427 (TOYOBO KK) [X] 1,8-13,18-20,22 * abstract * | [ ] - YAMANAKA M. ET AL., "Fibrillatable synthetic conjugate fibers for fabrics with high strengh and softness", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19931004), vol. 119, no. 14, Database accession no. 141100v, page 97, column 1 [ ] * abstract * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931203), vol. 017, no. 652, Database accession no. (M - 1520), & JP05213131 A 19930824 (TORAY IND INC) [DA] * abstract * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930510), vol. 017, no. 225, Database accession no. (C - 1055), & JP04361659 A 19921215 (TORAY IND INC) [DA] * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 37, no. 92, Database accession no. 92-304328, & JPH04209825 A 19920731 (NIPPON ESTER CO LTD) [A] * abstract * |