EP0669138 - Amniotic membrane graft or wrap to prevent adhesions or bleeding of internal organs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.01.1998 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.02.1998 [1998/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RESEARCH DEVELOPMENT FOUNDATION 402 North Division Street Carson City, Nevada 89703 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/35] | For all designated states RESEARCH DEVELOPMENT FOUNDATION 402 North Division Street Carson City Nevada 89703 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Young, Ronald L. 843 Merridel Street Houston, Texas 77024 / US | [1995/35] | Representative(s) | Wilkinson, Stephen John Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 St. Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/35] | Wilkinson, Stephen John Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 St. Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 95300884.4 | 13.02.1995 | [1995/35] | Priority number, date | US19940201442 | 24.02.1994 Original published format: US 201442 | [1995/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0669138 | Date: | 30.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0669138 | Date: | 14.02.1996 | [1996/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61L31/00, A61L27/00 | [1995/35] | CPC: |
A61L27/3683 (EP);
A61K35/50 (EP,KR);
A61L27/3604 (EP,KR);
A61L27/3687 (EP,KR);
A61L31/005 (EP,KR);
A61L2430/40 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/35] | Title | German: | Amnionmembranetransplantat oder Umhüllung zur Verhinderung von Adhäsionen oder Blutung von internen Organen | [1995/35] | English: | Amniotic membrane graft or wrap to prevent adhesions or bleeding of internal organs | [1995/35] | French: | Greffe ou enveloppe à base de membrane amniotique pour prévenir les adhésions ou le saignement d'organes internes | [1995/35] | Examination procedure | 29.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/39] | 02.09.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/09] | 01.10.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1998/09] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1997 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CA2055099 (RES DEV FOUNDATION [US]) [X] 1-19* claims 1-19 * |