EP0669775 - Method of prioritizing handoff procedures in a cellular system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.11.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.11.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.01.2003 [2003/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [1995/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Agrawal, Prathima 40 Colchester Road New Providence, New Jersey 07974 / US | 02 /
Anvekar, Dinesh K. 401 Route 22 West, Apt. 35G North Plainfield, New Jersey 07060 / US | 03 /
Narendran, Balakrishnan 127 Gales Drive, Apt. A7 New Providence, New Jersey 07974 / US | [1995/35] | Representative(s) | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 0TU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/35] | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al AT&T (UK) LTD., AT&T Intellectual Property Division, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 95300949.5 | 15.02.1995 | [1995/35] | Priority number, date | US19940201601 | 25.02.1994 Original published format: US 201601 | [1995/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0669775 | Date: | 30.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0669775 | Date: | 18.08.1999 | [1999/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/38, H04B7/26 | [1995/35] | CPC: |
H04W36/0085 (EP,US);
H04W72/56 (EP,KR,US);
H04W36/00838 (EP,KR,US);
H04W36/00837 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1995/35] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Priorisierung der Weiterreichenverfahren in einem zellularen System | [1995/35] | English: | Method of prioritizing handoff procedures in a cellular system | [1995/35] | French: | Procédé d'établissement de priorités des procédures de transferts d'appel dans un système cellulaire | [1995/35] | Examination procedure | 07.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/14] | 20.11.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH04290098 ; | [A]EP0369535 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LTD [GB], et al); | [A]WO9300777 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]); | [E]US5432842 (KINOSHITA YASUAKI [JP], et al); |