EP0671804 - Alternator with internal rectifier bridge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.08.2000 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.10.2000 [2000/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FORD MOTOR COMPANY The American Road Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/37] | For all designated states Ford Motor Company The American Road Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yockey, Steven John 28029 Greening Farmington Hills, Michigan 48334 / US | [1995/37] | Representative(s) | Messulam, Alec Moses Harrison IP Limited 3 Ebor House London Ebor Business Park Millfield Lane Nether Poppleton York YO26 6QY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/37] | Messulam, Alec Moses A. Messulam & Co. 24 Broadway Leigh on Sea Essex SS9 1BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 95300963.6 | 15.02.1995 | [1995/37] | Priority number, date | US19940208323 | 10.03.1994 Original published format: US 208323 | [1995/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0671804 | Date: | 13.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0671804 | Date: | 27.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H02K11/04 | [1995/37] | CPC: |
H02K11/05 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/37] | Title | German: | Drehstromgenerator mit innerer Gleichrichterbrücke | [1995/37] | English: | Alternator with internal rectifier bridge | [1995/37] | French: | Alternateur avec pont redresseur interne | [1995/37] | Examination procedure | 05.02.1996 | Examination requested [1996/15] | 17.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.04.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.07.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS6356354 ; | [A]US3078409 (BERTSCHE JR RALPH H, et al) [A] 1,8,9 * column 4, line 1 - line 39; figures 2,3 *; | [YD]US3184625 (FARISON GLENN S) [YD] 1,2,4-7,10,11 * column 3, line 70 - column 4, line 11; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US4055778 (BINDER GEORG) [A] 1* figure - *; | [A]EP0210090 (DUCELLIER & CIE [FR]) [A] 3 * figures 2B,3B *; | [YDA]EP0440395 (FORD MOTOR CO [GB], et al) [YD] 1,2,4-7,10,11 * column 7, line 46 - column 9, line 39 * * column 10, line 6 - line 10; figure - * [A] 12 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880728), vol. 012, no. 272, Database accession no. (M - 724), & JP63056354 A 19880310 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 12 * abstract * |