|
05.02.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.02.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.2004 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
44 |
|
26.08.2004 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
26.08.2004 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
26.08.2004 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
68 |
|
26.08.2004 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
44 |
|
26.08.2004 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
26.08.2004 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
22 |
|
25.08.2004 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.2004 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
8 |
|
14.06.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.06.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Appeal |
17 |
|
04.06.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
17 |
|
14.05.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.05.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.05.2004 |
Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division |
Appeal |
4 |
|
03.04.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.04.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.04.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.03.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.03.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.03.2004 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
12.03.2004 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.01.2004 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
05.01.2004 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
05.01.2004 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
45 |
|
05.01.2004 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.01.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.12.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.11.2002 |
Communication: Transfer of procedural status |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.11.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.11.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.11.2002 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.11.2002 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
05.11.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.09.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.09.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.09.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
16.09.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
16.05.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.05.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.05.2002 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.05.2002 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.05.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.05.2002 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.05.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.04.2002 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.04.2002 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.04.2002 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
29.04.2002 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.04.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Appeal |
30 |
|
29.04.2002 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
13 |
|
05.03.2002 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.03.2002 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.03.2002 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.03.2002 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.02.2002 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.02.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.01.2002 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.01.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.01.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.12.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.12.2001 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.12.2001 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.12.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.12.2001 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.12.2001 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.12.2001 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
12 |
|
27.12.2001 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.12.2001 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2001 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2001 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2001 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2001 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.2001 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.10.2001 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.01.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.2001 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.01.2001 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.01.2001 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.01.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.12.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.12.2000 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.11.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.11.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.11.2000 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
11 |
|
15.11.2000 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.2000 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.2000 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.11.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2000 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.10.2000 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.10.2000 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.10.2000 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.10.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.10.1999 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
19.08.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.08.1999 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.08.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.1999 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.1999 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.1999 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.03.1999 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.1999 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
30 |
|
17.03.1999 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
17.03.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
17.03.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
17.03.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
17.03.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.03.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
17.03.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.03.1999 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.1999 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.1999 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.1999 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
16.03.1999 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
17 |
|
16.03.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
16.03.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
16.03.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
16.03.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
16.03.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
16.03.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
16.03.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
10.03.1999 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
10.03.1999 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
25 |
|
07.03.1999 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.06.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.1998 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.1998 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.1998 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.1998 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.1998 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.03.1998 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.12.1997 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.12.1997 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.1997 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.09.1997 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
42 |
|
30.07.1997 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.07.1997 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.07.1997 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.07.1997 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.05.1997 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.1997 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.01.1997 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.06.1995 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.1995 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.04.1995 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.1995 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
06.04.1995 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
06.04.1995 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
42 |
|
06.04.1995 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
50 |
|
22.02.1995 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.1995 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.02.1995 |
Description |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
22.02.1995 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.02.1995 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.02.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.02.1995 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |