EP0675628 - Least cost routing device for separate connection into phone line [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.07.2001 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.08.2001 [2001/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rates Technology Inc. Crossroads Corporate Center 1393 Veterans Memorial Highway (Route 454) Suite 218 North Hauppauge, New York 11788-3067 / US | [2000/33] |
Former [1995/40] | For all designated states Rates Technology Inc. 222 Middle Country Road Smithtown, New York 11787 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weinberger, Gerald J. 11 Oak Tree Drive Smithtown, New York 11787 / US | 02 /
Lee, Roger C. RR1 Francis Street Wading River, New York 11792 / US | [1995/40] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2000/29] |
Former [1995/40] | Allam, Peter Clerk, et al LLOYD WISE, TREGEAR & CO. Norman House 105-109 Strand London WC2R 0AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 95301566.6 | 09.03.1995 | [1995/40] | Priority number, date | US19940210670 | 18.03.1994 Original published format: US 210670 | [1995/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0675628 | Date: | 04.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0675628 | Date: | 21.10.1998 | [1998/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H04M15/30, H04M1/27, H04M1/56 | [1995/40] | CPC: |
H04Q3/665 (EP,US);
H04M15/30 (EP,US);
H04M15/8044 (EP,US);
H04M2215/42 (EP,US);
H04M2215/745 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13103 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/1313 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13138 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13141 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/40] | Title | German: | Kostengünstigste Wegleitungsvorrichtung für separate Fernsprechleitungsverbindung | [1995/40] | English: | Least cost routing device for separate connection into phone line | [1995/40] | French: | Dispositif de recherche du chemin de moindre coût pour connexion séparée dans une ligne téléphonique | [1995/40] | Examination procedure | 09.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/23] | 10.10.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/34] | 25.01.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2001/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2001 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]WO8807797 (TREAT JOHN M [US]) [X] 1-5,7-12,14-16,18-21,23 * the whole document * [A] 6,17 [Y] 13,22; | [YA]US4585904 (MINCONE RAYMOND [US], et al) [Y] 13,22 * column 8, line 63 - line 66; figure 1 * [A] 1-12,14-21,23; | [A]GB2218595 (STC PLC [GB]) [A] 1-23 * the whole document *; | [A]US4888822 (WEINBERGER GERALD J [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * the whole document *; | [A]DE8712382U (CHRIST EUGEN) [A] 24-26 * the whole document *; | [A]US3943288 (REED FREDRIC L, et al) [A] 24,25; | [A]JPH05130192 ; | [A]JPH05219190 ; | [A]JPH01248858 ; | [A]US4480154 (KLEE MAURICE M [US]) [A] 24,25; | [A]US5062134 (LAIRD JAMES M [US]) [A] 24; | [A]US4924499 (SERBY VICTOR M [US]) [A] 24,25 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930913), vol. 017, no. 508, Database accession no. (E - 1431), & JP05130192 A 19930525 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 24-26 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931208), vol. 017, no. 665, Database accession no. (E - 1472), & JP05219190 A 19930827 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 24,25 * abstract * | [A] - C.H.SEDERHOLM ET AL, "INTELLIGENT TELEPHONE", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN., NEW YORK US, (198102), vol. 23, no. 9, pages 4006 - 4008, XP002074709 [A] 24-26 * figure 2 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891227), vol. 013, no. 594, Database accession no. (E - 867), & JP01248858 A 19891004 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRON CO) [A] 24-26 * abstract * |