EP0672389 - Video-based system for computer assisted surgery and localisation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.07.1999 [1999/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROKE MANOR RESEARCH LIMITED Roke Manor Romsey Hampshire, SO51 0ZN / GB | For all designated states UNITED MEDICAL AND DENTAL SCHOOLS GUY'S HOSPITAL London Bridge London SE1 9RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/38] | For all designated states ROKE MANOR RESEARCH LIMITED Roke Manor Romsey, Hampshire, SO51 0ZN / GB | ||
For all designated states UNITED MEDICAL AND DENTAL SCHOOLS GUY'S HOSPITAL London Bridge London SE1 9RT / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Evans, Richard John 33 Fordington Avenue Winchester, Hampshire SO22 5AN / GB | 02 /
Harris, Christopher-George 77 School Road, West Wellow Romsey, Hampshire SO51 6AR / GB | 03 /
Colchester, Alan Charles Francis The Old Rectory Stowting, Ashford, Kent TN25 6BE / GB | [1995/38] | Representative(s) | Allen, Derek Siemens Group Services Limited Intellectual Property Department Siemens House Oldbury, Bracknell Berkshire RG12 8FZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/38] | Allen, Derek Siemens Group Services Limited Intellectual Property Department Roke Manor Old Salisbury Lane Romsey Hampshire SO51 0ZN / GB | Application number, filing date | 95301696.1 | 14.03.1995 | [1995/38] | Priority number, date | GB19940005299 | 17.03.1994 Original published format: GB 9405299 | [1995/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0672389 | Date: | 20.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0672389 | Date: | 27.12.1996 | [1996/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0672389 | Date: | 05.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61B19/00, G06F19/00, G06T7/00 | [1996/50] | CPC: |
A61B90/10 (EP,US);
A61B34/20 (EP,US);
A61B90/39 (EP,US);
G16H20/40 (EP,US);
G16H30/40 (EP,US);
G16H40/63 (EP,US);
G16Z99/00 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00725 (EP,US);
A61B2034/2057 (EP,US);
A61B2034/2065 (EP,US);
A61B2090/363 (EP,US);
A61B2090/366 (EP,US);
A61B2090/373 (EP,US);
A61B2090/3916 (EP,US);
A61B2090/3937 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1995/38] | A61B19/00 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1995/38] | Title | German: | Videobasiertes System zur rechnerunterstützten Chirurgie und Lokalisierung | [1995/38] | English: | Video-based system for computer assisted surgery and localisation | [1995/38] | French: | Sytème à base vidéo pour chirurgie et localisation assistées par ordinateur | [1995/38] | Examination procedure | 08.02.1996 | Examination requested [1996/14] | 23.05.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 14.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 06.12.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 05.02.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9005494 (BESTA CARLO IST NEUROLOGICO [IT]) [A] 1,13 * abstract *; | [A]EP0429148 (ALLEN GEORGE S [US], et al) [A] 9-11* abstract *; | [A]DE4225112 (BODENSEEWERK GERAETETECH [DE]) [A] 1,2,5,6,8,9,13-15 * abstract * * column 3, lines 48-58 *; | [A] - CLARYSSE P ET AL, "A computer-assisted system for 3-D frameless localization in stereotaxic MRI", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MEDICAL IMAGING, DEC. 1991, USA, ISSN 0278-0062, vol. 10, no. 4, pages 523 - 529, XP002014248 [A] 1,13 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/42.108586 |