EP0674120 - Method and apparatus for charging dampers with pressurized gas [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.11.1998 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 07.08.2002 [2002/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MONROE AUTO EQUIPMENT COMPANY 1 International Drive Monroe Michigan 48161 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/39] | For all designated states MONROE AUTO EQUIPMENT COMPANY 1 International Drive Monroe Michigan 48161 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jones, Gareth Mark 101 Young Street Parkside 5063, South Australia / AU | 02 /
Jenkins, Jeffrey Alan 82 Highland Drive Bellevue Heights 5050, South Australia / AU | 03 /
Shnier, Michael Julian 63 Anglesey Avenue St Georges 5064, South Australia / AU | [1995/39] | Representative(s) | Price, Nigel John King J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/39] | Price, Nigel John King J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 95301762.1 | 16.03.1995 | [1995/39] | Priority number, date | US19940210039 | 17.03.1994 Original published format: US 210039 | [1995/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0674120 | Date: | 27.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0674120 | Date: | 21.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F16F9/43 | [1995/39] | CPC: |
F16F9/432 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [1995/39] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Gasfüllung von Dämpfer | [1995/39] | English: | Method and apparatus for charging dampers with pressurized gas | [1995/39] | French: | Méthode et appareil pour le remplissage des amortisseurs à gaz | [1995/39] | Examination procedure | 12.02.1996 | Examination requested [1996/15] | 07.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 14.07.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 22.07.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1997 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.05.1997 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 21.01.1998 | FR | 21.01.1998 | [2002/32] |
Former [2002/26] | ES | 21.01.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]US4194731 (MARX THOMAS O) [X] 1-3,5,7,8,12,14,17,18 * the whole document * [A] 6,9 [Y] 13,15,16; | [DY]US4491160 (AXTHAMMER LUDWIG ET AL) [DY] 13,15,16 * column 3, line 10 - column 4, line 51; figures 1-5 *; | [DX]US4114866 (KATO TETUO) [DX] 1,3-5,7-13 * the whole document *; | [XA]US4556092 (CUBALCHINI JOSEPH) [X] 1,3,4,7-9,12,13 * the whole document * [A] 6,10,11; | [A]US4475577 (CUBALCHINI JOSEPH) [A] 1,3,4,6-9,12,13 * the whole document * |