EP0673101 - Electrical power distribution monitoring system and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.2001 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.10.2001 [2001/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/43] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101 / JP | ||
Former [1995/38] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kanoi, Minoru 9-4, Minamidai, Tokai-mura Naka-gun, Ibaraki 319-11 / JP | 02 /
Imamura, Yuzuru 6-1, Mikanohara-cho 2-chome Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 316 / JP | 03 /
Yasukawa, Saburou 20-13, Higashiooshima 1-chome Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312 / JP | 04 /
Iwashita, Kiyoji 43-27, Nishinarusawa-cho 4-chome Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 316 / JP | 05 /
Takei, Toru 2917-26, Mawatari Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312 / JP | 06 /
Kudo, Hiroyuki 38-5, Kuji-cho 5-chome Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 319-12 / JP | 07 /
Kawakami, Junzo 449-61, Miwa 1-chome Mito-shi, Ibaraki 310 / JP | 08 /
Nishijima, Kazuo 2843-28, Mawatari Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312 / JP | 09 /
Inoue, Hiroshi 4-8, Daihara-cho 3-chome Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 316 / JP | [1995/38] | Representative(s) | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/38] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 95301786.0 | 17.03.1995 | [1995/38] | Priority number, date | JP19940048239 | 18.03.1994 Original published format: JP 4823994 | [1995/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0673101 | Date: | 20.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0673101 | Date: | 10.12.1997 | [1997/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0673101 | Date: | 25.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H02J3/14 | [1995/38] | CPC: |
H02J3/04 (EP,KR,US);
H02J13/00004 (KR);
G01R19/2513 (KR);
H02J13/00002 (EP,KR,US);
H02J3/00 (EP,US);
Y02E60/00 (EP,US);
Y04S10/30 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1995/38] | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zum Überwachen der Stromversorgung | [1995/38] | English: | Electrical power distribution monitoring system and method | [1995/38] | French: | Système et méthode de surveillance de distribution d'énergie électrique | [1995/38] | Examination procedure | 06.04.1995 | Examination requested [1995/38] | 29.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.02.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.01.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.07.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2192402 (RAFFINAGE CIE FRANCAISE [FR]) [A] 10 * the whole document *; | [A]US4336462 (HEDGES WALTER P, et al) [A] 1,10,13,16,17 * column W *; | [A]EP0055314 (CYBOREX LAB INC [US]) [A] 1,10,13,16,17 * the whole document *; | [XA]WO8501851 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 3-10,13,17; | [A]US4694192 (PAYNE PETER P [US], et al) [A] 1,10,13,16,17 * column W *; | [A] - CAMERON M M ET AL, "COMPUTER APPLICATIONS IN THE ELECTROCHEMICAL INDUSTRY", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INDUSTRY APPLICATIONS, (19881101), vol. 24, no. 6, pages 1074 - 1081, XP000112529 [A] 10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/28.17481 | [A] - R.ABELLA, "conduite et automatismes des postes et reseaux de distribution d electricite", JOURNEES D ETUDES SEE, FRANCE, (198307), no. 7/8, pages 443 - 453, XP002043679 [A] 10 * the whole document * |