EP0677809 - Automatic updating of computer software [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.10.2001 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.11.2001 [2001/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NCR International, Inc. 1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton Ohio 45479 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/23] | For all designated states NCR International, Inc. 1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton, Ohio 45479 / US | ||
Former [1995/42] | For all designated states AT&T GLOBAL INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INTERNATIONAL INC. 1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton, Ohio 45479 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Siefert, David M. 4519 Sweet Potato Ridge Road Englewood, OH 45322 / US | [1995/42] | Representative(s) | Cleary, Fidelma, et al NCR Limited International Patent Department 206 Marylebone Road London NW1 6LY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/05] | Cleary, Fidelma, et al International IP Department NCR Limited 206 Marylebone Road London NW1 6LY / GB | ||
Former [1996/24] | Robinson, Robert George, et al International Intellectual Property Department, NCR LIMITED, 915 High Road, North Finchley London N12 8QJ / GB | ||
Former [1995/42] | Robinson, Robert George International Intellectual Property Department AT&T GLOBAL INFORMATION SOLUTIONS LIMITED 915 High Road North Finchley London N12 8QJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 95301827.2 | 20.03.1995 | [1995/42] | Priority number, date | US19940217063 | 24.03.1994 Original published format: US 217063 | [1995/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0677809 | Date: | 18.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/445 | [1995/42] | CPC: |
G06F8/65 (EP,US);
Y10S707/99939 (US);
Y10S707/99945 (US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/42] | Title | German: | Automatische Aktualisierung von Rechnerprogrammen | [1995/42] | English: | Automatic updating of computer software | [1995/42] | French: | Mise à jour automatique de logiciel pour un ordinateur | [1995/42] | Examination procedure | 18.04.1996 | Examination requested [1996/24] | 31.05.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.01.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.04.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/47] | 01.06.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2001/47] | Request for further processing for: | 20.01.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 20.01.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.02.2000 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0106213 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1,2* page 2, line 12 - page 3, line 20 *; | [X]WO9222870 (ICL DATA AB [SE]) [X] 1-5 * page 1, line 1 - page 4, line 23 * * page 14, line 32 - page 15, line 8 * * page 40, line 3 - page 45, line 28 * |