EP0675048 - Pallet incorporating empty cans [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.11.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.01.1998 [1998/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIURA KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1343, Gokanjima Fujishi Shizuoka-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/40] | For all designated states FUJIURA KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1343, Gokanjima Fujishi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakamura, Yukihiko 13-9-5, Sengenkamicho Fujishi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | [1995/40] | Representative(s) | Ben-Nathan, Laurence Albert Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 30 Welbeck Street London W1G 8ER / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/40] | Ben-Nathan, Laurence Albert Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 91 Wimpole Street London W1M 8AH / GB | Application number, filing date | 95301915.5 | 21.03.1995 | [1995/40] | Priority number, date | JP19940085726 | 30.03.1994 Original published format: JP 8572694 | [1995/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0675048 | Date: | 04.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B65D19/28, B65D19/40 | [1995/40] | CPC: |
B65D19/00 (KR);
B65D19/0026 (EP);
B65D19/0038 (EP);
B65D19/40 (EP);
B65D2519/00024 (EP);
B65D2519/00059 (EP);
B65D2519/00094 (EP);
B65D2519/00288 (EP);
B65D2519/00318 (EP);
B65D2519/00323 (EP);
B65D2519/00333 (EP);
B65D2519/00343 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/40] | Title | German: | Leere Dosen beinhaltende Palette | [1995/40] | English: | Pallet incorporating empty cans | [1995/40] | French: | Palette comprenant des boîtes métalliques vides | [1995/40] | Examination procedure | 18.03.1996 | Examination requested [1996/20] | 20.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/02] | 01.08.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/02] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1997 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB656082 (TATE & LYLE LTD, et al) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH01254548 ; | [A]US3277847 (CHRISTIAN JENSEN) [A] 1 * column 3, line 38 - line 61; figure 2 *; | [A]FR2229622 (APPLIC THERMIQUES [FR]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 23 - page 4, line 6 *; | [A]FR2139742 (LANTZ GILBERT [FR]) [A] 2,5 * page 5, line 28 - page 6, line 34; figure 10 *; | [A]WO9003922 (CHINCHILLA GONZALEZ VICTOR M [SE]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890109), vol. 014, no. 006, Database accession no. (M - 916), & JP01254548 A 19891011 (TORU NAKAJIMA) [A] 1 * abstract * |