EP0677706 - Combustion control apparatus and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.09.1998 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.1998 [1998/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/42] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brown, Dale Marius 2338 Saint Joseph Drive Schenectady, New York 12309 / US | [1995/42] | Representative(s) | Szary, Anne Catherine, et al GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/12] | Szary, Anne Catherine, et al London Patent Operation, GE Technical Services Co. Inc., Essex House, 12-13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | ||
Former [1995/42] | Greenwood, John David, et al London Patent Operation, General Electric Technical Services Company, Inc., Essex House, 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 95302222.5 | 03.04.1995 | [1995/42] | Priority number, date | US19940226528 | 12.04.1994 Original published format: US 226528 | [1995/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0677706 | Date: | 18.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F23N5/08, F01D21/00 | [1995/42] | CPC: |
F23N5/003 (EP,US);
F01D21/003 (EP,US);
F23N5/082 (EP,US);
F23N1/02 (EP,US);
F23N2241/20 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1995/42] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Einrichtung zur Verbrennungsregelung | [1995/42] | English: | Combustion control apparatus and method | [1995/42] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de commande de combustion | [1995/42] | Examination procedure | 18.04.1996 | Examination requested [1996/24] | 03.11.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.05.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/45] | 10.06.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5257496 (BROWN DALE M [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * the whole document * |