EP0676796 - Method for manufacturing a semiconductor substrate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/41] | Semiconductor substrate and a method for manufacturing the same | ||
[2000/46] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.08.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.10.2003 [2003/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/41] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Inoue, Shunsuke, c/o Canon K.K. 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Miyawaki, Mamoru, c/o Canon K.K. 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Fukumoto, Yoshihiko, c/o Canon K.K. 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [1995/41] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/41] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 95302253.0 | 04.04.1995 | [1995/41] | Priority number, date | JP19940070396 | 08.04.1994 Original published format: JP 7039694 | [1995/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0676796 | Date: | 11.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0676796 | Date: | 06.03.1996 | [1996/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0676796 | Date: | 23.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/20, H01L21/76 | [1996/09] | CPC: |
H01L21/76251 (EP,US);
G02F1/136281 (EP,US);
Y10S148/012 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1995/41] | H01L21/20, H01L21/762 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1995/41] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Halbleitersubstrates | [2000/46] | English: | Method for manufacturing a semiconductor substrate | [2000/46] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un substrat semi-conducteur | [2000/46] |
Former [1995/41] | Halbleitersubstrat und Verfahren zur Herstellung | ||
Former [1995/41] | Semiconductor substrate and a method for manufacturing the same | ||
Former [1995/41] | Substrat semi-conducteur et procédé de fabrication | Examination procedure | 17.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/37] | 20.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.05.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.09.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 07.10.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 05.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 15.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/42] | Request for further processing for: | 07.10.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 07.10.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.10.1999 | Decision despatched | 30.05.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 30.05.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 24.07.1997 | Decision despatched | 30.05.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 30.05.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 24.07.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4939101 (BLACK ROBERT D [US], et al) [A] 1-8,11-14* column 6, line 60 - line 66; claims 1,5-7 *; | [XY]US5213986 (PINKER RONALD D [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,7,16-19 * column 3, line 3 - line 18; figures 1-3; claims 1-8 * [Y] 11-15; | [YA] - W.P. MASZARA, "EPI-LESS BOND-AND-ETCH-BACK SILICON -ON-INSULATOR BY MeV ION IMPLANTATION.", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, NEW YORK US, (19910617), vol. 58, no. 24, doi:doi:10.1063/1.104784, pages 2779 - 2781, XP000233463 [Y] 11-15 * page 2779, column L, paragraph 3 - column R, paragraph 2 * [A] 9,10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.104784 |