EP0680932 - Electrochemical deionisation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2002 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Accentus Plc 329 Harwell Didcot, Oxfordshire OX11 0QJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/38] | For all designated states Accentus plc 329 Harwell Didcot, Oxfordshire OX11 0QJ / GB | ||
Former [2001/32] | For all designated states AEA Technology plc 329 Harwell Didcot, Oxfordshire OX11 0QJ / GB | ||
Former [1996/32] | For all designated states AEA Technology plc 329 Harwell Didcot, Oxfordshire OX11 0RA / GB | ||
Former [1995/45] | For all designated states UNITED KINGDOM ATOMIC ENERGY AUTHORITY Harwell Didcot, Oxfordshire OX11 0RA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Turner, Andrew Derek 17 Loyd Close Abingdon, Oxfordshire OX14 1XR / GB | 02 /
Jones, Christopher Peter 44 Burnet Close, Woodhall Park, Haydon Wick Swindon, Wiltshire SN2 2RT / GB | 03 /
Neville, Mark David 7 Wordsworth Close Stanford-in-the-Vale Oxfordshire SN7 8JA / GB | 04 /
Hill, Michael Raphael Hugh 15 Bryan Way, Charlton Heights Wantage, Oxfordshire OX12 7EH / GB | [1995/45] | Representative(s) | Lofting, Marcus John, et al Accentus plc, Patents Department, 329 Harwell Didcot, Oxfordshire, OX11 0QJ / GB | [2001/38] |
Former [1996/32] | Lofting, Marcus John, et al AEA Technology plc, Patents Department, 329 Harwell Didcot, Oxfordshire, OX11 0RA / GB | ||
Former [1995/45] | Mansfield, Peter Turquand, et al United Kingdom Atomic Energy Authority, Patents Department, 329 Harwell Didcot, Oxfordshire OX11 0RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 95302796.8 | 26.04.1995 | [1995/45] | Priority number, date | GB19940009194 | 06.05.1994 Original published format: GB 9409194 | GB19940010270 | 20.05.1994 Original published format: GB 9410270 | GB19950001536 | 26.01.1995 Original published format: GB 9501536 | [1995/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0680932 | Date: | 08.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0680932 | Date: | 13.05.1998 | [1998/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0680932 | Date: | 08.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/469 | [1995/45] | CPC: |
B01D61/48 (EP);
B01J47/08 (EP);
C02F1/4691 (EP);
C02F1/4695 (EP);
C02F1/62 (EP);
C02F1/42 (EP);
C02F1/4604 (EP);
C02F2001/46133 (EP);
C02F2101/103 (EP);
C02F2101/163 (EP);
C02F2103/40 (EP);
C02F2201/46115 (EP);
C23F2201/02 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, IT [1995/45] | Title | German: | Elektrochemische Deionisation | [1995/45] | English: | Electrochemical deionisation | [1995/45] | French: | Désionisation électrolytique | [1995/45] | Examination procedure | 17.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/38] | 02.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.12.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 19.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 07.02.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 08.08.2001 | ES | 28.02.2002 | [2008/06] |
Former [2004/04] | ES | 28.02.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2240551 (UK ATOMIC ENGERGY AUTHORITY) [A] 1; | [A]EP0621072 (NIPPON RENSUI CO.) [A] 1-8; | [A]EP0415482 (ESMIL WATER SYSTEMS B.V.) [A] 1,4,5 |