EP0683474 - Method for determining payoffs in reel-type slot machines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.1999 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.06.1999 [1999/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WMS GAMING, INC. 3401 North California Avenue Chicago, Illinois 60618 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/47] | For all designated states WMS GAMING, INC. 3401 North California Avenue Chicago, Illinois 60618 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Durham, Timothy J. 630 North Taylor Oak Park, Illinois 60302 / US | [1995/47] | Representative(s) | Allman, Peter John, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Sussex House 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/47] | Allman, Peter John, et al MARKS & CLERK, Sussex House, 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | Application number, filing date | 95302850.3 | 27.04.1995 | [1995/47] | Priority number, date | US19940246791 | 20.05.1994 Original published format: US 246791 | [1995/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0683474 | Date: | 22.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0683474 | Date: | 19.03.1997 | [1997/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0683474 | Date: | 08.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G07F17/32 | [1997/11] | CPC: |
G07F17/34 (EP,US);
G07F17/3244 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/47] | G07F17/34 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1995/47] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Bestimmung der Auszahlungen in Spielautomaten mit Walzen | [1995/47] | English: | Method for determining payoffs in reel-type slot machines | [1995/47] | French: | Méthode pour déterminer la somme à débiter dans les machines-de-jeu du type à tambour | [1995/47] | Examination procedure | 27.05.1997 | Examination requested [1997/30] | 24.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.01.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5169147 (HAMANO JUNICHI [JP]) [X] 1-4,6,7 * column 4, line 60 - column 6, line 33; figures 10-13 * [A] 5 |