EP0683491 - Transducer head solder connection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.2001 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.07.2001 [2001/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/47] | For all designated states INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORPORATION Armonk, NY 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pattanaik, Surya 2796 Glauser Drive San Jose, CA 95133 / US | [1995/47] | Representative(s) | Moss, Robert Douglas IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/47] | Moss, Robert Douglas IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 95303258.8 | 16.05.1995 | [1995/47] | Priority number, date | US19940246052 | 19.05.1994 Original published format: US 246052 | [1995/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0683491 | Date: | 22.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0683491 | Date: | 13.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0683491 | Date: | 26.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G11B21/10, G11B5/48 | [1995/47] | CPC: |
G11B5/4853 (EP,US);
G11B21/02 (KR);
G11B21/106 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/47] | Title | German: | Lötverbindung für Wandlerkopf | [1995/47] | English: | Transducer head solder connection | [1995/47] | French: | Connection soudée de tête de transducteur | [1995/47] | Examination procedure | 08.03.1996 | Examination requested [1996/19] | 14.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 12.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 11.12.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.04.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0128931 ; | [A]JPS56111234 ; | [DA]US4761699 (AINSLIE NORMAN G [US], et al) [DA] 1-19 * column W * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890519), vol. 13, no. 216, Database accession no. (E - 760), & JP128931 A 19890131 (NEC CORP.) [A] 1-19 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19811125), vol. 5, no. 186, Database accession no. (E - 084), & JP56111234 A 19810902 (HIITACHI LTD.) [A] 1-19 * abstract * | by applicant | US3823416 | US4167765 | US4761699 | - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, (197909), vol. 22, no. 4, pages 1602 - 1603 | - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, (199302), vol. 36, no. 2, page 371 |