EP0690123 - Process for increasing liquid surfactant loading in free flowing powder detergents [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.05.2002 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.07.2002 [2002/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amway Corporation 7575 East Fulton Road Ada Michigan 49355-0001 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/01] | For all designated states Amway Corporation 7575 East Fulton Road Ada Michigan 49355-0001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Staley, David S. 3280 Brook Hollow Drive, NE Rockford, Michigan 49341 / US | [1996/01] | Representative(s) | Rees, David Christopher, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/25] | Rees, David Christopher, et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [1996/01] | Robinson, Anthony John Metcalf, et al Kilburn & Strode 30 John Street London, WC1N 2DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 95303849.4 | 06.06.1995 | [1996/01] | Priority number, date | US19940269371 | 30.06.1994 Original published format: US 269371 | [1996/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0690123 | Date: | 03.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0690123 | Date: | 25.02.1998 | [1998/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C11D11/00, C11D3/10 | [1998/06] | CPC: |
C11D11/0082 (EP,US);
C11D17/06 (EP,US);
C11D3/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/01] | C11D11/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1996/01] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Erhöhung der Beladung mit flüssigen Tensiden in frei fliessenden pulverförmigen Detergentien | [1996/01] | English: | Process for increasing liquid surfactant loading in free flowing powder detergents | [1996/01] | French: | Procédé pour augmenter le chargement d'agent, tensio-actif, liquide dans des poudres de détergents à écoulement libre | [1996/01] | Examination procedure | 24.08.1998 | Examination requested [1998/43] | 01.01.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/27] | 07.02.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2001 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]EP0637628 (AMWAY CORP [US]) [PX] 1-4,6-9,16,17 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2124523 (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [D]US3769222 (YURKO J, et al); | [A]US4666740 (WIXON HAROLD E [US]) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * claim - *; | [A]GB1583081 (UNILEVER LTD) [A] 1,2 * page 2, line 11 - line 16 * * claim - *; | [A]EP0513824 (KAO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * page 3, line 35 - line 38 *; | [A]JPH05202399 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 93, no. 36, Database accession no. 93-285613, XP002050251 & JPH05202399 A 19930810 (KAO CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * |