EP0686384 - Disposable body fluids absorbent padding [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2003 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.02.2003 [2003/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNI-CHARM CORPORATION 182 Shimobun Kinsei-cho Kawanoe-shi Ehime-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/10] | For all designated states UNI-CHARM CORPORATION 182 Shimobun, Kinsei-cho Kawanoe-shi Ehime-ken / JP | ||
Former [1995/50] | For all designated states UNI-CHARM CORPORATION 182, Shimobun Kinsei-cho Kawanoe-shi Ehime-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mizutani, Satoshi 547-3 Kamibun-cho Kawanoe-shi, Ehime-ken / JP | 02 /
Kitaoka, Hideaki 2-21-16 Takinoi Funabashi.shi, Chiba-ken / JP | [1995/50] | Representative(s) | Murgatroyd, Susan Elizabeth, et al Baron Warren Redfern 1000 Great West Road Brentford TW8 9DW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/50] | Murgatroyd, Susan Elizabeth, et al Baron & Warren 18 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 95303914.6 | 07.06.1995 | [1995/50] | Priority number, date | JP19940124975 | 07.06.1994 Original published format: JP 12497594 | [1995/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0686384 | Date: | 13.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0686384 | Date: | 08.10.1997 | [1997/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0686384 | Date: | 06.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/15, A61F13/50 | [1995/50] | CPC: |
A61F13/513 (EP,US);
A61F13/51394 (EP,KR,US);
A61F2013/51165 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1995/50] | Title | German: | Wegwerfbares Kissen zum Absorbieren von Körperflüssigkeiten | [1995/50] | English: | Disposable body fluids absorbent padding | [1995/50] | French: | Coussin à jeter pour absorber des liquides corporels | [1995/50] | Examination procedure | 13.02.1998 | Examination requested [1998/16] | 12.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.08.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1352539 (EKBERG ET AL.) [A] 1,8 * figure - *; | [A]US3236238 (MORSE EDWARD A) [A] 1,8* figures 13-17 *; | [A]GB1236904 (CELANESE CORP [US]) [A] 1,8 * figure 4; claim 1 *; | [A]US4397644 (MATTHEWS BILLIE J, et al) [A] 1,8 * figure 2; claim 1 *; | [A]US4634440 (WIDLUND LEIF U R [SE], et al) [A] 1,8 * abstract *; | [A]EP0489205 (KANG NA HSIUNG ENTERPRISE CO L [TW]) [A] 1,8 * abstract *; | [A]EP0587118 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND [JP], et al) [A] 1,8 * abstract *; | [A]GB2272917 (UNI CHARM CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1,8 * abstract * | by applicant | JPS571340 |