EP0695003 - Rare earth element-doped multiple-core optical fiber, method for fabricating the same, and optical amplifier using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.07.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.09.1998 [1998/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Cable, Ltd. 1-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/05] | For all designated states HITACHI CABLE, LTD. 1-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | ||
For all designated states SHIN-ETSU CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 6-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Imoto, Katsuyuki 19-20, Kamiokutomi Sayama-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 02 /
Koya, Kazuo 13-1, Isobe 2-chome Annaka-shi, Gunma-ken / JP | [1996/05] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Peter Arthur GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/05] | Jackson, Peter Arthur GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 95303954.2 | 08.06.1995 | [1996/05] | Priority number, date | JP19940175366 | 27.07.1994 Original published format: JP 17536694 | [1996/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0695003 | Date: | 31.01.1996 | [1996/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0695003 | Date: | 10.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/06, G02B6/06, G02B6/16 | [1996/05] | CPC: |
C03B37/01222 (EP,US);
G02B6/02042 (EP,US);
H01S3/06708 (EP,US);
C03B2201/10 (EP,US);
C03B2201/28 (EP,US);
C03B2201/31 (EP,US);
C03B2201/36 (EP,US);
C03B2203/12 (EP,US);
C03B2203/29 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/05] | Title | German: | Optische Mehrkernfaser mit Dotierung aus seltenen Erden, Herstellungsmethode dafür und optischer Verstärker mit dieser Faser | [1996/05] | English: | Rare earth element-doped multiple-core optical fiber, method for fabricating the same, and optical amplifier using the same | [1996/05] | French: | Fibre optique à coeur multiple dotée de terres rares, méthode de fabrication et amplificateur optique utilisant celle-ci | [1996/05] | Examination procedure | 12.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/37] | 10.02.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.03.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.06.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JPH0637385 ; | [PA]JPH06216441 ; | [A]EP0504479 (CORNING INC [US]) [A] 7,8,10,11,13,14 * page 4, line 34 - page 5, line 24; figures 5,7 *; | [A]EP0571126 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]) [A] 1,7 * column 5, line 47 - column 7, line 20; figures 1,6-11 * | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940516), vol. 018, no. 255, Database accession no. (E - 1548), & JP06037385 A 19940210 (HITACHI CABLE LTD) [AD] 1,2,4,6,10 * abstract * | [PA] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 94, no. 36, Database accession no. 94-289032, & JPH06216441 A 19940805 (HITACHI CABLE LTD) [PA] 1,3 * title * | [A] - A.SEKO ET AL., "Fiber laser plate", APPLIED OPTICS, NEW YORK US, vol. 18, no. 12, pages 2052 - 2055 [A] 1,3 * page 2052, column L; figures 1-3 * | [A] - M. SHIGEMATSU ET AL., ELECTRONICS & COMMUNICATIONS IN JAPAN, PART I - COMMUNICATIONS, NEW YORK US, vol. 76, no. 5, pages 1 - 10 [A] 11,13,14 * figures 4,10 * | by applicant | JPH05299733 | JPH0637385 |