EP0690521 - A mechanically rechargeable, electrochemical metal-air battery [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.2000 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELECTRIC FUEL (E.F.L.) LIMITED 5 Kiryat Mada Street Har Hotzvim Science Park P.O. Box 23073 Jerusalem 91230 / IL | [N/P] |
Former [1996/01] | For all designated states ELECTRIC FUEL (E.F.L.) LIMITED 5 Kiryat Mada Street Har Hotzvim Science Park P.O. Box 23073 Jerusalem 91230 / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Korall, Menachem 14 Israel Porat Street Ramot, Jerusalem / IL | 02 /
Haratz, Yehuda 45 Melavey HaShayarot Street Jerusalem / IL | 03 /
Sassen, Jonathan 523/10 Neve Yaakov Jerusalem / IL | 04 /
Goldstein, Jonathan Russell 33/1 Rabbi Haim Vital Street Jerusalem / IL | [1996/01] | Representative(s) | Baverstock, Michael George Douglas, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/01] | Baverstock, Michael George Douglas, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London, EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 95303981.5 | 09.06.1995 | [1996/01] | Priority number, date | US19940269846 | 01.07.1994 Original published format: US 269846 | [1996/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0690521 | Date: | 03.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0690521 | Date: | 03.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H01M12/06, H01M2/16 | [1996/01] | CPC: |
H01M12/065 (EP,US);
H01M50/417 (EP,US);
H01M50/423 (EP,US);
H01M2004/024 (EP,US);
H01M4/02 (EP,US);
H01M50/44 (EP,US);
H01M50/46 (EP,US);
H01M8/0273 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y02E60/50 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/01] | Title | German: | Mechanische wiederaufladbare Metall-Luft Batterie | [1996/01] | English: | A mechanically rechargeable, electrochemical metal-air battery | [1996/01] | French: | Batterie du type métal/air rechargeables par voie mécanique | [1996/01] | Examination procedure | 19.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/33] | 20.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.07.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.12.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.03.1999 | BE | 03.03.1999 | CH | 03.03.1999 | ES | 03.03.1999 | GR | 03.03.1999 | LI | 03.03.1999 | SE | 03.03.1999 | DK | 03.06.1999 | PT | 04.06.1999 | IE | 09.06.1999 | LU | 09.06.1999 | [2004/39] |
Former [2003/45] | AT | 03.03.1999 | |
BE | 03.03.1999 | ||
CH | 03.03.1999 | ||
ES | 03.03.1999 | ||
GR | 03.03.1999 | ||
LI | 03.03.1999 | ||
SE | 03.03.1999 | ||
DK | 03.06.1999 | ||
PT | 04.06.1999 | ||
IE | 09.06.1999 | ||
Former [2003/17] | AT | 03.03.1999 | |
BE | 03.03.1999 | ||
CH | 03.03.1999 | ||
ES | 03.03.1999 | ||
GR | 03.03.1999 | ||
LI | 03.03.1999 | ||
SE | 03.03.1999 | ||
PT | 04.06.1999 | ||
IE | 09.06.1999 | ||
MC | 30.06.1999 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 03.03.1999 | |
BE | 03.03.1999 | ||
CH | 03.03.1999 | ||
ES | 03.03.1999 | ||
GR | 03.03.1999 | ||
LI | 03.03.1999 | ||
SE | 03.03.1999 | ||
PT | 04.06.1999 | ||
IE | 09.06.1999 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 03.03.1999 | |
BE | 03.03.1999 | ||
CH | 03.03.1999 | ||
GR | 03.03.1999 | ||
LI | 03.03.1999 | ||
SE | 03.03.1999 | ||
PT | 04.06.1999 | ||
IE | 09.06.1999 | ||
Former [2001/23] | AT | 03.03.1999 | |
BE | 03.03.1999 | ||
CH | 03.03.1999 | ||
GR | 03.03.1999 | ||
LI | 03.03.1999 | ||
PT | 04.06.1999 | ||
IE | 09.06.1999 | ||
Former [2001/09] | AT | 03.03.1999 | |
BE | 03.03.1999 | ||
CH | 03.03.1999 | ||
LI | 03.03.1999 | ||
PT | 04.06.1999 | ||
IE | 09.06.1999 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 03.03.1999 | |
BE | 03.03.1999 | ||
CH | 03.03.1999 | ||
LI | 03.03.1999 | ||
PT | 04.06.1999 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 03.03.1999 | |
BE | 03.03.1999 | ||
PT | 04.06.1999 | ||
CH | 08.06.1999 | ||
LI | 08.06.1999 | ||
Former [2000/23] | AT | 03.03.1999 | |
BE | 03.03.1999 | ||
PT | 04.06.1999 | ||
Former [2000/21] | AT | 03.03.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH02253573 ; | [YA]FR2005494 (LEESONA CORP) [Y] 1,4 * page 7, line 15 - page 10, line 8 * * claims 1-8 * [A] 2,3,5; | [A]DE2009063 (LEESONA CORP.) [A] 1-4 * page 4, paragraph 2 * * page 7, paragraph 2 - page 12, paragraph 1 *; | [A]GB1214452 (QUALCAST LTD) [A] 1 * page 1, line 70 - page 2, line 115 *; | [A]US3645794 (HAMLEN ROBERT P, et al) [A] 1-4 * column 2, line 30 - column 3, line 35 *; | [Y]EP0555581 (ELECTRIC FUEL LTD [IL]) [Y] 1,4 * column 12, lines 5-46 *; | [A]WO9408358 (VOLTEK INC [US]) [A] 1,5* page 23, line 28 - page 24, line 19 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19901225), vol. 14, no. 580, Database accession no. (E - 1017), & JP2253573 A 00000000 (TOSHIBA BATTERY CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | US3416966 | US3513030 | US4139679 | US5196275 | US19950265693 | US19920964644 |