EP0687466 - Homeopathic formulations [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.02.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.03.1997 [1997/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TAPUACH NATURAL TECHNOLOGIES (1993) LTD. 6 Weizmann Street Ramat Hasharon 47227 / IL | [1995/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Amitai, Gabriel 11 Aharoni Street Rehovot 76281 / IL | 02 /
Borenstein, Amiram 1 Bareket Street Rishon Lezion 75436 / IL | [1995/51] | Representative(s) | Goldin, Douglas Michael J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/51] | Goldin, Douglas Michael J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 95304210.8 | 16.06.1995 | [1995/51] | Priority number, date | IL19940110035 | 16.06.1994 Original published format: IL 11003594 | [1995/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0687466 | Date: | 20.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/00, A61K9/28 | [1995/51] | CPC: |
A61K9/1635 (EP);
A61K9/1652 (EP);
A61K9/5078 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/51] | Title | German: | Homöopatische Zubereitungen | [1995/51] | English: | Homeopathic formulations | [1995/51] | French: | Formulations homéopathiques | [1995/51] | File destroyed: | 13.09.2003 | Examination procedure | 20.06.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/13] | 30.10.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1997/13] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3835221 (FULBERTH W, et al) [X] 1-5,7-11 * column 1 - column 2; example 1 *; | [X]EP0107557 (LARUELLE CLAUDE) [X] 1-11 * page 2, paragraph 2 *; | [X]EP0306423 (MEDIBREVEX [FR]) [X] 1,2,6-11 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9117745 (SOUTHWEST RES INST [US]) [X] 1-6,10,11* claims 1,2,5 * |