EP0689030 - Displacement measuring method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.2002 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.11.2002 [2002/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/52] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsumoto, Takahiro c/o Canon K.K., Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Sentoku, Koichi c/o Canon K.K., Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [1995/52] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/52] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 95304254.6 | 19.06.1995 | [1995/52] | Priority number, date | JP19940137406 | 20.06.1994 Original published format: JP 13740694 | [1995/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0689030 | Date: | 27.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0689030 | Date: | 03.07.1996 | [1996/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0689030 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G01B9/02, G01J9/04 | [1996/26] | CPC: |
G01B9/02007 (EP,US);
G01B9/02003 (EP,US);
G01B9/02019 (EP,US);
G01B9/02022 (EP,US);
G01D5/266 (EP,US);
G01B2290/45 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1995/52] | G01B9/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [1995/52] | Title | German: | Apparat und Verfahren zum Messen einer Verschiebung | [1995/52] | English: | Displacement measuring method and apparatus | [1995/52] | French: | Appareil et méthode de mesure de déplacements | [1995/52] | Examination procedure | 13.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/02] | 17.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.02.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 30.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.01.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/48] | Request for further processing for: | 30.04.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 30.04.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.05.1999 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4912530 (BESSHO YOSHINORI [JP]) [X] 1,7,13 * introduction * * column 3, line 59 - column 8, line 65; figures 1,2 * * column 9, line 17 - column 9, line 50; figure 4 *; | [X]EP0536655 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1,5-7,11-13 * page 7, line 17 - page 9, line 21; figure 3 *; | [X]US3790284 (BALDWIN R) [X] 1,7,13 * column 3, line 11 - column 4, line 29; figures 1,2 * * column 5, line 16 - column 6, line 20; figures 5A,5B * | by applicant | JPH0290006 | JPH02259407 | - APPLIED PHYSICS, (1989), vol. 58, no. 10, page 89 |