EP0694834 - User interface for multiple child windows [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.08.2002 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.10.2002 [2002/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/05] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bibayan, Farzad 3188 Pullman Street Costa Mesa, California 92626 / US | [1996/05] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/05] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 95304513.5 | 27.06.1995 | [1996/05] | Priority number, date | US19940268940 | 30.06.1994 Original published format: US 268940 | [1996/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0694834 | Date: | 31.01.1996 | [1996/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0694834 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/44 | [1996/05] | CPC: |
G06F9/451 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/05] | Title | German: | Benutzeroberfläche für eine Mehrzahl von untergeordneten Fenstern | [1996/05] | English: | User interface for multiple child windows | [1996/05] | French: | Interface utilisateur pour plusieurs fenêtres affiliées | [1996/05] | Examination procedure | 12.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/32] | 17.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.01.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 04.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.04.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/41] | Request for further processing for: | 04.04.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 04.04.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.04.2000 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY] - D. BLAIN, K. DELIMON & J. ENGLISH:, Real-World Programming for OS/2 2.1, USA, SAMS, (1993) [X] 1,2,6,7,16,17,19,26,27,33,34 * page 87, line 12 - line 18; figure 3.11 * * page 119, paragraph L - page 120, line 1; figures 3.13,3.14 * * page 225, paragraph L - page 227, line 11 * [A] 4,8-13,20-25,28-31,35-40 [Y] 5,15,18,32,42 | [Y] - T. BURGE & J. CELI:, Advanced OS/2 Presentation Manager Programming, NEW YORK, USA, JOHN WILEY & SONS, INC., (1993) [Y] 5,15,18,32,42 * page 165, line 1 - page 169, paragraph L * | [A] - "Multiple Mode Dialog Support for Single Threaded Applications", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, NEW YORK, USA, (199403), vol. 37, no. 3, pages 81 - 82 [A] 9-13,21-25,28,29,31,36-40 * the whole document * | [A] - IBM:, Systems Application Architecture Common User Access Advanced Interface Design Guide, USA, IBM, (198906) [A] 1-42 * page 50, line 1 - line 7 * * page 68, line 9 - line 12 * * page 69, line 14 - line 17 * * page 115, line 1 - page 124, line 16; figures 56-57 * | by applicant | - PERZOLD, Programming Windows 3.1 | US19910808757 |