EP0693737 - Method and apparatus for managing multiprocessor graphical workload distribution [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.11.1998 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.12.1998 [1998/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/04] | For all designated states INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORPORATION Armonk, NY 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Narayanaswami, Chandrasekhar 11028 Jollyville Road, No. 350 Austin, TX 78759 / US | 02 /
Saha, Avijit 3456 North Hills, No. 341 Austin, TX 78741 / US | [1996/04] | Representative(s) | Williams, Julian David IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Mail Point 110 Hursley Park, Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/04] | Williams, Julian David IBM United Kingdom Limited, Intellectual Property Department, Hursley Park Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 95304517.6 | 27.06.1995 | [1996/04] | Priority number, date | US19940286711 | 21.07.1994 Original published format: US 286711 | [1996/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0693737 | Date: | 24.01.1996 | [1996/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0693737 | Date: | 08.01.1997 | [1997/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G06T1/20 | [1996/04] | CPC: |
G06T1/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/04] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Apparat zum Verwalten der Aufgaben in einem Mehrprozessorsystem | [1996/04] | English: | Method and apparatus for managing multiprocessor graphical workload distribution | [1996/04] | French: | Méthode et appareil de gestion de la charge de travail d'un multi-processeur graphique | [1996/04] | Examination procedure | 28.05.1996 | Examination requested [1996/30] | 20.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/53] | 31.07.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1998 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH03177961 | [X] - ROWAN G, "Real images in real-time", COMPUTER GRAPHICS 88, LONDON, UK, 11-13 OCT. 1988, ISBN 0-86353-152-0, 1988, PINNER, UK, BLENHEIM ONLINE, UK, pages 13 - 23, XP000607912 [X] 1-3,7-9,13 * page 20, paragraph 4.3 - line 1 * | [X] - WILLEBEEK-LEMAIR M ET AL, "Region growing on a highly parallel mesh-connected SIMD computer", PROCEEDINGS. THE 2ND SYMPOSIUM ON THE FRONTIERS OF MASSIVELY PARALLEL COMPUTATION (CAT. NO.88CH2649-2), FAIRFAX, VA, USA, 10-12 OCT. 1988, ISBN 0-8186-5892-4, 1989, WASHINGTON, DC, USA, IEEE COMPUT. SOC. PRESS, USA, pages 93 - 100, XP000078184 [X] 1-4,6-10,12,13 * page 94, column L; figures 1,2 * | [X] - PALMER M E ET AL, "Rotation invariant partitioning for concurrent scientific visualization", PARALLEL COMPUTATIONAL FLUID DYNAMICS. NEW ALGORITHMS AND APPLICATIONS. PROCEEDINGS OF THE PARALLEL CFD '94 CONFERENCE, PROCEEDINGS OF PARALLEL COMPUTATIONAL FLUID DYNAMICS: NEW ALGORITHMS AND APPLICATIONS, KYOTO, JAPAN, 16-19 MAY 1994, ISBN 0-444-82317-4, 1995, AMSTERDAM, NETHERLANDS, ELSEVIER, NETHERLANDS, pages 409 - 416, XP000607777 [X] 1,7,13 * page 410, paragraph 2.1.; figure 1 * | [PX] - TONG-YEE LEE ET AL, "Load balancing strategies for ray tracing on parallel processors", PROCEEDINGS OF 1994 IEEE REGION 10'S NINTH ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE. THEME: FRONTIERS OF COMPUTER TECHNOLOGY (CAT. NO.94CH3417-3), PROCEEDINGS OF TENCON'94 - 1994 IEEE REGION 10'S 9TH ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON: 'FRONTIERS OF COMPUTER, ISBN 0-7803-1862-5, 1994, NEW YORK, NY, USA, IEEE, USA, pages 177 - 181 vol.1, XP000529468 [PX] 1,7,13 * page 177, column R, paragraph 2 * * page 178, column L, paragraph 3 * | [A] - WILLEBEEK-LEMAIR M H ET AL, "Strategies for dynamic load balancing on highly parallel computers", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON PARALLEL AND DISTRIBUTED SYSTEMS, SEPT. 1993, USA, ISSN 1045-9219, vol. 4, no. 9, pages 979 - 993, XP000433124 [A] 1-13 * page 980, column L, paragraph II * * page 981, column L, paragraph III * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/71.243526 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911031), vol. 015, no. 430, Database accession no. (P - 1270), & JP03177961 A 19910801 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-13 * abstract * |