EP0695852 - High proppant concentration/high CO2 ratio fracturing system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.03.2000 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.04.2000 [2000/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANADIAN FRACMASTER LTD 1700 Fracmaster Tower, 355 Fourth Avenue SW. Calgary Alberta, T2P OJ1 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1996/06] | For all designated states CANADIAN FRACMASTER LTD 1700 Fracmaster Tower, 355 Fourth Avenue SW. Calgary, Alberta, T2P OJ1 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Luk, Samuel 11 Silverstone Bay N.W. Calgary, Alberta T3B 4Y8 / CA | 02 /
Grisdale, John 100 Mt. Cascade Ct., S.E. Calgary, Alberta T2Z 2K5 / CA | [1996/06] | Representative(s) | Abbie, Andrew Kenneth, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/06] | Abbie, Andrew Kenneth, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 95305380.8 | 01.08.1995 | [1996/06] | Priority number, date | CA19942129613 | 05.08.1994 Original published format: CA 2129613 | [1996/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0695852 | Date: | 07.02.1996 | [1996/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0695852 | Date: | 02.05.1997 | [1997/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | E21B43/267 | [1996/06] | CPC: |
E21B43/267 (EP,US);
Y10S507/924 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, GB, NL, SE [1996/06] | Title | German: | Frakturations-System mit hoher Stützmittelkonzentration und hohem CO2-Anteil | [1996/06] | English: | High proppant concentration/high CO2 ratio fracturing system | [1996/06] | French: | Système de fracturation avec concentration d'agent de soutènement et proportion de CO2 élevées | [1996/06] | Examination procedure | 07.10.1997 | Examination requested [1997/49] | 23.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.11.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/17] | 01.12.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2000/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]CA1134258 (CANADIAN FRACMASTER LTD) [DA] 1-3,15 * claim 1 *; | [DA]CA1242389 (HALLIBURTON CO) [DA] 1-3,25 * claim 1 * | by applicant | CA687938 | CA745453 | CA932655 | CA1000483 | CA1034363 | CA1043091 | CA1197977 | CA1241826 | CA1242389 |