EP0758592 - Reclining mechanism for vehicle seat [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2001 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.03.2001 [2001/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARACO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 25, Kamifujiike, Yoshiwara-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/08] | For all designated states ARACO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 25, Kamifujiike, Yoshiwara-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maruta, Tsutomu, 33-7 Araimaehigashi, Aza Higashionuma, Oaza, Shimoyama-mura Higashi kamo-gun, Aichi-ken / JP | 02 /
Tatematsu, Kazuhisa 4-318, Tsuchihara, Tenpaku-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [1997/08] | Representative(s) | Chettle, Adrian John, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/08] | Chettle, Adrian John, et al Withers & Rogers 4, Dyer's Buildings Holborn London EC1N 2JT / GB | Application number, filing date | 95305659.5 | 14.08.1995 | [1997/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0758592 | Date: | 19.02.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0758592 | Date: | 22.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/22 | [1997/08] | CPC: |
B60N2/235 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | FR [1997/19] |
Former [1997/08] | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE | Title | German: | Neigungsverstellmechanismus für Fahrzeugsitze | [1997/08] | English: | Reclining mechanism for vehicle seat | [1997/08] | French: | Mécanisme d'inclinaison pour sièges de véhicules | [1997/08] | Examination procedure | 15.08.1996 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.12.1996 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) DE, GB, IT, SE | 14.08.1997 | Examination requested [1997/42] | 18.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 09.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 07.09.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 10.12.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 23.09.1996 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.09.1996 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 23.09.1996 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.09.1996 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2241884 (TACHI S CO [JP]) [X] 1 * page 4, line 3 - page 6, line 1; figures 1-8 *; | [X]GB2284987 (AISIN SEIKI [JP]) [X] 1 * page 3, line 2 - page 5, line 8; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE4441159 (AISIN SEIKI [JP]); | [A]DE2829701 (HAMMERSTEIN GMBH C ROB) |