EP0702308 - System for implementing high speed peripheral bus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.2003 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES, INC. One AMD Place Mail Stop 68 P.O. Box 3453 Sunnyvale CA 94088-3453 / US | [2008/36] |
Former [1996/12] | For all designated states ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES INC. One AMD Place, P.O. Box 3453 Sunnyvale, California 94088-3453 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Sherman 28531 Cedarbluff Drive Rancho Palos Verdes, CA 90275 / US | 02 /
Wisor, Michael T. 4608 Saloma Place Austin, Texas 78744 / US | [1996/12] | Representative(s) | Brookes IP Windsor House 6-10 Mount Ephraim Road Tunbridge Wells, Kent TN1 1EE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/44] | Brookes Batchellor 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | ||
Former [1996/12] | Wright, Hugh Ronald, et al Brookes & Martin 52/54 High Holborn London WC1V 6SE / GB | Application number, filing date | 95305759.3 | 17.08.1995 | [1996/12] | Priority number, date | US19940308151 | 19.09.1994 Original published format: US 308151 | [1996/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0702308 | Date: | 20.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0702308 | Date: | 15.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/42, G06F1/08 | [1996/12] | CPC: |
G06F1/08 (EP,US);
G06F13/4217 (EP,US);
G06F13/423 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LU, NL, PT, SE [1996/12] | Title | German: | System zur Durchführung eines Hochgeschwindigkeitsperipheriebus | [1996/12] | English: | System for implementing high speed peripheral bus | [1996/12] | French: | Système pour mettre en oeuvre un bus périphérique à haute vitesse | [1996/12] | Examination procedure | 26.08.1996 | Examination requested [1996/43] | 28.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 31.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 04.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.01.2003 | BE | 15.01.2003 | FR | 15.01.2003 | GR | 15.01.2003 | IT | 15.01.2003 | NL | 15.01.2003 | DK | 15.04.2003 | PT | 15.04.2003 | SE | 15.04.2003 | ES | 30.07.2003 | LU | 17.08.2003 | IE | 18.08.2003 | [2008/06] |
Former [2005/49] | AT | 15.01.2003 | |
BE | 15.01.2003 | ||
FR | 15.01.2003 | ||
GR | 15.01.2003 | ||
NL | 15.01.2003 | ||
DK | 15.04.2003 | ||
PT | 15.04.2003 | ||
SE | 15.04.2003 | ||
ES | 30.07.2003 | ||
LU | 17.08.2003 | ||
IE | 18.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/40] | AT | 15.01.2003 | |
BE | 15.01.2003 | ||
GR | 15.01.2003 | ||
NL | 15.01.2003 | ||
DK | 15.04.2003 | ||
PT | 15.04.2003 | ||
SE | 15.04.2003 | ||
ES | 30.07.2003 | ||
LU | 17.08.2003 | ||
IE | 18.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 15.01.2003 | |
BE | 15.01.2003 | ||
GR | 15.01.2003 | ||
NL | 15.01.2003 | ||
DK | 15.04.2003 | ||
PT | 15.04.2003 | ||
SE | 15.04.2003 | ||
ES | 30.07.2003 | ||
LU | 17.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/10] | AT | 15.01.2003 | |
BE | 15.01.2003 | ||
GR | 15.01.2003 | ||
NL | 15.01.2003 | ||
DK | 15.04.2003 | ||
PT | 15.04.2003 | ||
SE | 15.04.2003 | ||
ES | 30.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 15.01.2003 | |
GR | 15.01.2003 | ||
NL | 15.01.2003 | ||
DK | 15.04.2003 | ||
PT | 15.04.2003 | ||
SE | 15.04.2003 | ||
ES | 30.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | AT | 15.01.2003 | |
GR | 15.01.2003 | ||
NL | 15.01.2003 | ||
DK | 15.04.2003 | ||
PT | 15.04.2003 | ||
SE | 15.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/47] | AT | 15.01.2003 | |
GR | 15.01.2003 | ||
NL | 15.01.2003 | ||
PT | 15.04.2003 | ||
SE | 15.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/46] | GR | 15.01.2003 | |
NL | 15.01.2003 | ||
PT | 15.04.2003 | ||
SE | 15.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | NL | 15.01.2003 | |
PT | 15.04.2003 | ||
SE | 15.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | NL | 15.01.2003 | |
SE | 15.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/30] | SE | 15.04.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]EP0453199 (IBM [US]) [X] 1-21 * column 3, line 44 - column 6, line 54; figures 1-4 * [A] 26-32 [Y] 22-25; | [YA]EP0613074 (ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES INC [US]) [Y] 22-25 * claims 1,2 * [A] 26-32; | [A] - BAILEY, "PCI Local Bus Breaks Data Bottleneck to Open Up PC Technology", COMPUTER TECHNOLOGY REVIEW, LOS ANGELES US, vol. 12, no. 11, pages 15 - 17, XP000397475 [A] 22-25 * page 16, column R, paragraph 3 - paragraph 5 * |