EP0702243 - Scan testable double edge triggered scan cell [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.2004 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics Limited 1000 Aztec West, Almondsbury Bristol BS12 4SQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/08] | For all designated states STMicroelectronics Limited 1000 Aztec West, Almondsbury Bristol BS12 4SQ / GB | ||
Former [1996/12] | For all designated states SGS-THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS LTD. 1000 Aztec West, Almondsbury Bristol BS12 4SQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Felix, Stephen 34 Lake Road Westbury-on-Trym, Bristol, Avon / GB | [1996/12] | Representative(s) | Driver, Virginia Rozanne, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/12] | Driver, Virginia Rozanne, et al Page White & Farrer 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 95305863.3 | 22.08.1995 | [1996/12] | Priority number, date | GB19940017591 | 01.09.1994 Original published format: GB 9417591 | [1996/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0702243 | Date: | 20.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0702243 | Date: | 03.04.1996 | [1996/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0702243 | Date: | 07.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/3185, G06F11/267, H03K3/037 | [1996/12] | CPC: |
H03K3/0375 (EP,US);
G01R31/318541 (EP,US);
G01R31/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/12] | Title | German: | Abtastprüfbare doppelflankengesteuerte Abtastzelle | [1996/12] | English: | Scan testable double edge triggered scan cell | [1996/12] | French: | Unité avec balayage déclenché par les double-flancs testables par balayage | [1996/12] | Examination procedure | 02.10.1996 | Examination requested [1996/49] | 23.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2002 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   28.10.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 07.01.2004 | DE | 08.04.2004 | [2008/06] |
Former [2005/12] | DE | 08.04.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0137165 (IBM [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US5172011 (LEUTHOLD DALE H [US], et al) [A] 1* column A *; | [A]US5179295 (MATTISON PHILLIP E [US], et al) [A] 1 * figure 1 * |