EP0700117 - Patch antenna assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.03.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.03.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.04.2000 [2000/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PILKINGTON PLC Prescot Road St. Helens Merseyside WA10 3TT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/10] | For all designated states PILKINGTON PLC Prescot Road St. Helens, Merseyside WA10 3TT / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Day, Stephen Roland 2 Park Hey Drive Appley Bridge, Wigan WN6 9JD / GB | [1996/10] | Representative(s) | Palmer, Roger, et al PAGE, WHITE & FARRER 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | [1996/10] | Application number, filing date | 95305997.9 | 29.08.1995 | [1996/10] | Priority number, date | GB19940017401 | 30.08.1994 Original published format: GB 9417401 | [1996/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0700117 | Date: | 06.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q9/04 | [1996/10] | CPC: |
H01Q9/0457 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/10] | Title | German: | Streifenleitungsantennenanordnung | [1996/10] | English: | Patch antenna assembly | [1996/10] | French: | Agencement d'antenne à microbande | [1996/10] | Examination procedure | 06.09.1996 | Examination requested [1996/45] | 04.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/16] | 12.11.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2000/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1999 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2685130 (THOMSON APPLIC RADARS CENTRE [FR]) [A] 1,6,13 * abstract *; | [A]US5241321 (TSAO CHICH-HSING A [US]) [A] * the whole document *; | [DA]EP0590928 (PILKINGTON PLC [GB]) [DA] * the whole document *; | [A] - EDIMO ET AL., "OPTIMISED FEEDING OF DUAL POLARISED BROADBAND APERTURE-COUPLED PRINTED ANTENNA", ELECTRONIC LETTERS, GB, (19920910), vol. 28, no. 19, pages 1785 - 1787, XP000319097 [A] 1,6,8,13 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5043738 | EP19930307667 |