EP0700068 - Apparatus and method for isotopic ratio plasma mass spectrometry [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 24.10.1997 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.1997 | Refusal of application | published on 10.12.1997 [1997/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thermo Instrument Systems Inc 504 Airport Road Santa Fe, New Mexico 87504-2108 / US | [1997/19] |
Former [1997/16] | For all designated states FISONS plc RPR House, 50 Kings Hill Avenue, Kings Hill West Malling, Kent ME19 4TA / GB | ||
Former [1996/10] | For all designated states FISONS plc Fison House Princes Street Ipswich Suffolk IP1 1QH / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gray, Alan Lyle 4 Dene Lane Farnham, Surrey GU10 3PW / GB | 02 /
Liezers, Martin 567 Swanlow Lane Winsford, Cheshire CW7 4BP / GB | 03 /
Williams, John Gareth 119 Connaught Road Brookwood, Woking, Surrey GU24 0EU / GB | [1996/10] | Representative(s) | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/05] | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | ||
Former [1996/10] | Tomlinson, Kerry John Frank B. Dehn & Co. European Patent Attorneys Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 95306028.2 | 30.08.1995 | [1996/10] | Priority number, date | GB19940017700 | 02.09.1994 Original published format: GB 9417700 | [1996/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0700068 | Date: | 06.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H01J49/10 | [1996/10] | CPC: |
H01J49/067 (EP,US);
H01J49/105 (EP,US);
B01D59/44 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/10] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Isotopenverhältnisbestimmung durch Plasmamassenspektrometrie | [1996/10] | English: | Apparatus and method for isotopic ratio plasma mass spectrometry | [1996/10] | French: | Dispositif et méthode pour la détermination de rapports isotopiques par spectrométrie de masse | [1996/10] | Examination procedure | 04.03.1996 | Examination requested [1996/18] | 06.12.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.07.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1997/50] | 26.07.1997 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1997/50] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1997 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9009031 (VG INSTR GROUP [GB]) [A] 1,7 * page 10, line 27 - page 11, line 15 ** page 13, line 23 - page 15, line 17 *; | [A]DE4107794 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1,6,7 * sentence 12 - sentence 20; figure 2; claim 1 * * column 1, line 64 - column 3 *; | [A]WO9216008 (FISONS PLC [GB]) [A] 1,7 * page 16, line 10 - line 22; figure 2; claim 12 * |