EP0700811 - A vehicle safety belt system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.09.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states European Components Co. Limited 770 Upper Newtownards Road Dundonald Belfast BT16 0UL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/11] | For all designated states European Components Co. Limited 770 Upper Newtownards Road Dundonald, Belfast BT16 0UL / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kopetzky, Robert Thomas Am Nohl 43/1 D-89173 Lonsee / DE | 02 /
Boyd, Leslie Samuel 3, Prospect Gardens Carrickfergus Co.Antrim BT38 8QX / IE | [1996/11] | Representative(s) | Allen, William Guy Fairfax J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/11] | Allen, William Guy Fairfax J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 95306205.6 | 06.09.1995 | [1996/11] | Priority number, date | GB19940018044 | 07.09.1994 Original published format: GB 9418044 | GB19940019541 | 28.09.1994 Original published format: GB 9419541 | [1996/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0700811 | Date: | 13.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0700811 | Date: | 11.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B60R22/26, B60N2/36 | [1996/11] | CPC: |
B60N2/366 (EP,US);
B60R22/18 (EP,US);
B60R22/26 (EP,US);
B60N2205/35 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1996/11] | Title | German: | Fahrzeug-Sicherheitsgurtsystem | [1996/11] | English: | A vehicle safety belt system | [1996/11] | French: | Système de ceinture de sécurité pour véhicule | [1996/11] | Examination procedure | 09.04.1996 | Examination requested [1996/23] | 02.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.04.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.08.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 11.11.1998 | FR | 11.11.1998 | IT | 11.11.1998 | SE | 11.11.1998 | [2008/06] |
Former [2006/14] | ES | 11.11.1998 | |
FR | 11.11.1998 | ||
SE | 11.11.1998 | ||
Former [2002/26] | ES | 11.11.1998 | |
SE | 11.11.1998 | ||
FR | 09.04.1999 | ||
Former [2002/23] | SE | 11.11.1998 | |
FR | 09.04.1999 | ||
Former [2000/22] | FR | 09.04.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPS61191453 ; | [Y]US3365231 (HALL BURTT BILLY) [Y] 2 * column 3, line 17 - column 4, line 5; figure 3 *; | [XA]FR2627133 (AUTOFLUG GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 6; | [XA]EP0432824 (SAAB AUTOMOBILE [SE]) [X] 1,7,8 * column 5, line 29 - column 7, line 12; figures 5,6 * * column 8, line 8 - line 33; figure 3 * * column 2, line 45 - line 50 * [A] 6; | [XA]EP0471573 (GEN ENGINEERING BV [NL]) [X] 1,7,8 * column W * [A] 6; | [A]DE4239492 (GROSS GERHARD DIPL ING FH [DE]) [A] 3 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2252746 (PEUGEOT & RENAULT [FR]) [A] 4 * page 1 - page 4; figure - *; | [A]DE3635992 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 5,7 * the whole document * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870116), vol. 011, no. 016, Database accession no. (M - 554), & JP61191453 A 19860826 (NISSAN MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * [Y] 2 |