EP0701008 - Epitaxy for growing compound semiconductors and an InP substrate for epitaxial growth [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.11.1998 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.01.1999 [1999/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, LIMITED 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/11] | For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, LIMITED 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oida, Kazuhiko, c/o Itami Works of Sumitomo Elec. Ind. Ltd., 1-1 Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi, Hyogo / JP | 02 /
Nakai, Ryusuke, c/o Itami Works of Sumitomo Elec. Ind. Ltd., 1-1 Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi, Hyogo / JP | [1996/11] | Representative(s) | Smith, Norman Ian, et al Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/11] | Smith, Norman Ian, et al F.J. CLEVELAND & COMPANY 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 95306232.0 | 06.09.1995 | [1996/11] | Priority number, date | JP19940240680 | 08.09.1994 Original published format: JP 24068094 | [1996/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0701008 | Date: | 13.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0701008 | Date: | 26.06.1996 | [1996/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0701008 | Date: | 14.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C30B25/18 | [1996/24] | CPC: |
C30B23/02 (EP,US);
C30B25/02 (EP,US);
C30B29/40 (EP,US);
Y10S117/902 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1996/11] | C30B29/40, C30B25/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/11] | Title | German: | Epitaxie zur Züchtung von Verbindunghalbleitern und InP Substraten für das Epitaxiezüchten | [1996/11] | English: | Epitaxy for growing compound semiconductors and an InP substrate for epitaxial growth | [1996/11] | French: | Epitaxie pour la croissance de semi-conducteurs composés et un substrat de InP pour la croissance épitaxiale | [1996/11] | Examination procedure | 24.05.1996 | Examination requested [1996/30] | 26.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.07.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JPS6415914 ; | [AD]JPS6432686 | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890510), vol. 013, no. 195, Database accession no. (E - 754), & JP01015914 A 19890119 (NEC CORP) [AD] 1-9 * abstract * | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890523), vol. 013, no. 220, Database accession no. (E - 762), & JP01032686 A 19890202 (NEC CORP) [AD] 1-9 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH06240680 | JPH02239188 | JPH05301795 | JPS6432686 | JPS6415914 | JPH01270599 | JPH0473610 | JPH0316993 | JPH02288223 | JPH01128423 |