EP0700790 - Printing apparatus and method for controlling the temperature of the printing head of such printing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2001 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 27.03.2002 [2002/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/11] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miyake, Hiroyuki, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Kurata, Mitsuru, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Ebata, Tokihide, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Kuriyama, Hiroyuki, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Miura, Yasushi, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 06 /
Irizawa, Takeshi, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1996/11] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/11] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 95306294.0 | 08.09.1995 | [1996/11] | Priority number, date | JP19940215897 | 09.09.1994 Original published format: JP 21589794 | [1996/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0700790 | Date: | 13.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0700790 | Date: | 19.06.1996 | [1996/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0700790 | Date: | 31.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B41J29/377, B41J2/05 | [1996/11] | CPC: |
B41J2/04528 (EP,US);
B41J2/04563 (EP,US);
B41J2/0458 (EP,US);
B41J2/04581 (EP,US);
B41J2/04588 (EP,US);
B41J2/04596 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/11] | Title | German: | Druckvorrichtung und Verfahren zur Steuerung der Druckkopftemperatur in einer solchen Druckvorrichtung | [1996/11] | English: | Printing apparatus and method for controlling the temperature of the printing head of such printing apparatus | [1996/11] | French: | Appareil d'impression et procédé de contrôle de la température de la tête d'impression d'un tel appareil d'impression | [1996/11] | Examination procedure | 04.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/01] | 02.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.12.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 09.02.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 21.10.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 03.11.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/20] | Request for further processing for: | 09.02.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 09.02.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.03.1999 | Decision despatched | 24.03.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 24.03.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 09.04.1998 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DE | 01.09.2000 | [2002/13] | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP0317341 (CANON KK [JP]) [Y] 1 * column 5, line 20 - column 7, line 30; figures 1,2 * [A] 2,4,7,8,15,18,23; | [YDA]US5107276 (KNEEZEL GARY A [US], et al) [YD] 1 * column 7, line 57 - column 8, line 66; figures 2,5A * [A] 2,4,6-8,10-13,25; | [A]US5017941 (DRAKE DONALD J [US]) [A] 1,2,4,8,10,15,18 * column 4, line 13 - column 5, line 45; figures 1,2A *; | [A]US5084713 (WONG MARVIN G [US]) [A] 1,2,4,7,8,10,15,18,23,26 * column 5, line 12 - column 7, line 5; figures 4-8 * | by applicant | US4910528 | JPH034394 | JPS6117670 | JPH01127361 | JPH0343254 | JPH0447948 | US4929963 | EP0573062 | JPS6253492 | JPH0346589 | US4723129 | US4740796 | US4463359 | US4345262 | US4313124 | US4558333 | US4459600 | JPS59123670 | JPS59138461 | JPS5456847 | JPS6071260 |