EP0707044 - Absorbable polymer blends [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.2001 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.02.2001 [2001/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETHICON, INC. U.S. Route 22 Somerville, NJ 08876 / US | [1996/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cooper, Kevin 15 Arrighi Drive Warren, NJ 07059 / US | 02 /
Arnold, Steven C. 26 Hideaway Lane Sparta, NJ 07871 / US | 03 /
Scopelianos, Angelo 7 John Stevens Road Whitehouse Station, NJ 08889 / US | [1996/16] | Representative(s) | Fisher, Adrian John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/16] | Fisher, Adrian John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 95307158.6 | 10.10.1995 | [1996/16] | Priority number, date | US19940320634 | 11.10.1994 Original published format: US 320634 | [1996/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0707044 | Date: | 17.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0707044 | Date: | 05.06.1996 | [1996/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0707044 | Date: | 15.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C08L67/04, A61L31/00, // (C08L67/04, 67:04),(C08L67/04, 67:04, 67:04) | [1996/16] | CPC: |
A61L17/12 (EP,US);
A61L27/26 (EP,US);
A61L31/041 (EP,US);
A61L31/06 (EP,US);
C08L67/04 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A61L27/26, C08L67/04 (US,EP);
A61L31/041, A61B17/58, C08L67/04, C08L67/04, C08L67/04 (EP,US);
A61L31/041, C08L67/04 (US,EP);
A61L31/06, A61B17/58, A61B17/08, C08L67/04 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/16] | Title | German: | Absorbierbare Polymer-Mischungen | [1996/16] | English: | Absorbable polymer blends | [1996/16] | French: | Mélanges de polymères absorbables | [1996/16] | Examination procedure | 12.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/02] | 03.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.05.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 13.08.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 14.09.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0401844 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM KG [DE], et al) [A] 1-14 * claims 1-14 *; | [A]EP0185453 (ETHICON INC [US]) [A] 1-14 * claims 1,2,4,5 *; | [A]WO9411441 (UNIV GRONINGEN [NL], et al) [A] 1-14 * claims 1-11 *; | [A]EP0440416 (ETHICON INC [US]) [A] 1,3 * claims 1-8 * | by applicant | US5080665 | US5320624 | CA2079274 | CA2079275 | US4643191 | US4653497 | US5007923 | US5047048 |