EP0708244 - Double diaphragm pump [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/17] | Reduced icing air valve | ||
[1999/48] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.2001 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.07.2001 [2001/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY 200 Chestnut Ridge Road Woodcliff Lake, New Jersey 07675-8738 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/06] | For all designated states INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY 200 Chestnut Ridge Road Woodcliff Lake New Jersey 07675-8738 / US | ||
Former [1996/17] | For all designated states THE ARO CORPORATION One Aro Center Bryan, Ohio 43506-0151 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kozumplik, Nicholas, Jr. 01506 State Rt. 15 Bryan, Ohio 43506 / US | 02 /
Elfers, Robert C. 101 Norlick Place Bryan, Ohio 43506 / US | [1996/17] | Representative(s) | Feakins, Graham Allan, et al Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow, G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/17] | Feakins, Graham Allan, et al RAWORTH, MOSS & COOK RAWORTH HOUSE 36 Sydenham Road Croydon, Surrey CRO 2EF / GB | Application number, filing date | 95307360.8 | 16.10.1995 | [1996/17] | Priority number, date | US19940324201 | 17.10.1994 Original published format: US 324201 | [1996/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0708244 | Date: | 24.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0708244 | Date: | 23.10.1996 | [1996/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0708244 | Date: | 09.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.1996 | Classification | IPC: | F04B43/073 | [1996/17] | CPC: |
F04B43/0733 (EP,US);
Y10T137/2544 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/17] | Title | German: | Doppelmembranpumpe | [1999/48] | English: | Double diaphragm pump | [1999/48] | French: | Double pompe à diaphragme | [2000/31] |
Former [1996/17] | Luftventil mit Vereisungsschutz | ||
Former [1996/17] | Reduced icing air valve | ||
Former [1996/17] | Clapet d'air anti-givrage | Examination procedure | 12.04.1997 | Examination requested [1997/24] | 10.05.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.02.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.05.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0061706 (DEPA GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4 * column W *; | [PA]US5366353 (HAND KENT P [US]) [PA] 1 * column W *; | [A]GB1301386 (ROSEN SAMUEL R ET AL) [A] 1 * the whole document * |